Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. IT Spin Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03475 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
IT Spin Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 6 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 5:31 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3475 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:57 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Sunday, November 01, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 11/01 10:47 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/01/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, October 29, 2020 | ||
10 | 10
order
Default Judgment
Thu 10/29 8:26 PM
Order Granting Default Judgment Against Defendant IT Spin, Inc. Signed on 10/29/2020 (emiller) |
|
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 12/04 2:37 PM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:08 AM
Summons Service Executed on IT Spin Inc. 6/3/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/29 10:55 AM
Summons Issued on IT Spin Inc. Date Issued 5/29/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/29 9:52 AM
*Official Court Seal not on image. Summons Issued on IT Spin Inc. Date Issued 5/29/2019. (MelissaMorgan) Modified on 5/29/2019 (MelissaMorgan). Related document(s)7 Summons Issued. Modified on 5/29/2019 (MelissaMorgan) |
|
Sunday, May 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/26 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/26/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Fri 05/24 6:00 AM
|
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 05/23 11:12 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on IT Spin Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Thu 05/23 11:10 AM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 05/23 11:09 AM
Adversary case 19-03475 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against IT Spin Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |