Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. The Directv Group, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03479 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 23, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
The Directv Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/26 2:47 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3479 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 9:59 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Thursday, January 30, 2020 | ||
14 | 14
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Thu 01/30 12:27 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice
Thu 10/03 11:04 AM
Notice of Fifth Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice
Thu 09/12 12:10 PM
Notice of Fourth Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice
Thu 08/29 11:32 AM
Notice of Third Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Wed 07/31 1:01 PM
Notice of Second Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice
Wed 06/26 10:00 AM
Notice Of Stipulation By And Between The Trustee And Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 06/07 1:36 PM
Summons Service Executed on The Directv Group, Inc. 6/3/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/29 11:01 AM
Summons Issued on The Directv Group, Inc. Date Issued 5/29/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
6 | 6
court
Summons Issued
Wed 05/29 9:59 AM
*Official Court Seal not on image. Summons Issued on The Directv Group, Inc. Date Issued 5/29/2019. (MelissaMorgan) Modified on 5/29/2019 (MelissaMorgan). Related document(s)7 Summons Issued. Modified on 5/29/2019 (MelissaMorgan) |
|
Sunday, May 26, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 05/26 11:45 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 05/26/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Fri 05/24 6:00 AM
|
|
Thursday, May 23, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 05/23 11:57 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on The Directv Group, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Thu 05/23 11:56 AM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 05/23 11:53 AM
Adversary case 19-03479 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against The Directv Group, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |