Original Case: 3:15-md-02672

Ninth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:19-cv-16074
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Case Filed:May 22, 2019
Terminated:Aug 17, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Aug 19, 2020 1:31 AM PDT
In re: VOLKSWAGEN "CLEAN DIESEL" MARKETING, SALES PRACTICES, AND PRODUCTS LIABILITY LITIGATION
Defendant - Appellee
VOLKSWAGEN GROUP OF AMERICA, INC.
Represented By
Sharon Nelles
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Robert J. Giuffra Jr.
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
William Brian Monahan
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Andrew Finn
Sullivan & Cromwell LLP
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
JAMES BEN FEINMAN
Represented By
James Ben Feinman
James B. Feinman & Associates
contact info


Docket last updated: 08/19/2020 1:28 AM PDT
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
1 1 DOCKETED CAUSE AND ENTERED APPEARANCES OF COUNSEL AND PRO SE APPELLANT. SEND MQ: No. The schedule is set as follows: Transcript ordered by 06/24/2019. Transcript due 07/22/2019. Appellant James Ben Feinman opening brief due 08/29/2019. Appellee Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. answering brief due 09/30/2019. Appellant's optional reply brief is due 21 days after service of the answering brief. [11305914] (RT) [Entered: 05/22/2019 01:14 PM]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Docketing Letter
Att: 2 22 pgs Case Opening Packet
2 2 6 pgs Received copy of amended notice of appeal from district court filed on 05/22/2019. [11305975] (QDL) [Entered: 05/22/2019 01:39 PM]
Related: [-]