Maryland District Court
Judge:Catherine C Blake
Case #: 1:19-cv-01548
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:May 24, 2019
Terminated:Jul 03, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 20, 2019 4:03 AM EST
Defendant
8057 Ritchie Highway, LLC
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Michael L. Antwerpen
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Jacob M. Antwerpen
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
David G. Antwerpen
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Tricaz III Properties, LLC
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
J.A. Motorcars, Inc.
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Antwerpen-HK, Inc.
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Antwerpen Volkswagen, Inc.
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Antwerpen Nissan, Inc.
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Antwerpen Hyundai, Inc.
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Antwerpen Auto World LLC
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Antwerpen Motorcars Ltd.
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
9400 Liberty Limited Partnership
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
A&I Realty LLLP
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Ant Car Wash LLC
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Defendant
Antoy LLC
Represented By
Aron U Raskas
Rifkin Weiner Livingston
contact info
Arnold M Weiner
Rifkin Weiner Livingston Levitan & Silver, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Clarksville AMD T, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Clarksville AMD RE, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Owings Mills AMD N, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Pasadena AMD RE, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Pasadena AMD V, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Pike AMD C, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Pike AMD H, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Randallstown AMD RE, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Clarksville AMD N, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Woodlawn AMD N, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Woodlawn AMD RE, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Clarksville AMD H, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Atlantic MD RE, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Atlantic MD AG, LLC
Represented By
Phillippe Lieberman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
William W Carrier, III
Tydings And Rosenberg LLP
contact info
Alan J. Kluger
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info
Ryan Bollman
Kluger Kaplan Silverman Katzen And Levine PA
contact info


Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
17 17 2 pgs order Order Wed 07/03 11:08 AM
MARGINAL ORDER approving16 Plaintiffs' Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice. Signed by Judge Catherine C. Blake on 7/3/2019. (krs, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
16 16 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 07/02 5:08 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Atlantic MD AG, LLC, Atlantic MD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD H, LLC, Clarksville AMD N, LLC, Clarksville AMD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD T, LLC, Owings Mills AMD N, LLC, Pasadena AMD RE, LLC, Pasadena AMD V, LLC, Pike AMD C, LLC, Pike AMD H, LLC, Randallstown AMD RE, LLC, Woodlawn AMD N, LLC, Woodlawn AMD RE, LLC (Carrier, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/25 6:24 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Aron U Raskas on behalf of All Defendants (Raskas, Aron)
Related: [-]
14 14 notice Notice of Appearance Tue 06/25 6:22 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Arnold M Weiner on behalf of All Defendants (Weiner, Arnold)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction Tue 06/25 6:13 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction of Subject-Matter by 8057 Ritchie Highway, LLC, 9400 Liberty Limited Partnership, A&I Realty LLLP, Ant Car Wash LLC, Antoy LLC, David G. Antwerpen, Jacob M. Antwerpen, Michael L. Antwerpen, Antwerpen Auto World LLC, Antwerpen Hyundai, Inc., Antwerpen Motorcars Ltd., Antwerpen Nissan, Inc., Antwerpen Volkswagen, Inc., Antwerpen-HK, Inc., J.A. Motorcars, Inc., Tricaz III Properties, LLC(Weiner, Arnold)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Memorandum in Support Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction,
Att: 2 Affidavit Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 3 Exhibit Ex. 1 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 4 Exhibit Ex. 2 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 5 Exhibit Ex. 3 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 6 Exhibit Ex. 4 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 7 Exhibit Ex. 5 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 8 Exhibit Ex. 6 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 9 Exhibit Ex. 7 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 10 Exhibit Ex. 8 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 11 Exhibit Ex. 9 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 12 Exhibit Ex. 10 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 13 Exhibit Ex. 11 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 14 Exhibit Ex. 12 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 15 Exhibit Ex. 13 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 16 Exhibit Ex. 14 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 17 Exhibit Ex. 15 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 18 Exhibit Ex. 16 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 19 Exhibit Ex. 17 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 20 Exhibit Ex. 18 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 21 Exhibit Ex. 19 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 22 Exhibit Ex. 20 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 23 Exhibit Ex. 21 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 24 Exhibit Ex. 22 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 25 Exhibit Ex. 23 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 26 Exhibit Ex. 24 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 27 Exhibit Ex. 25 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 28 Exhibit Ex. 26 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 29 Exhibit Ex. 27 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 30 Exhibit Ex. 28 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 31 Exhibit Ex. 29 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 32 Exhibit Ex. 30 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 33 Exhibit Ex. 31 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 34 Exhibit Ex. 32 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 35 Exhibit Ex. 33 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 36 Exhibit Ex. 34 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 37 Exhibit Ex. 35 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 38 Exhibit Ex. 36 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 39 Exhibit Ex. 37 to the Declaration of Jacob M. ("Jack") Antwerpen,
Att: 40 Affidavit Declaration of Stanford D. Hess,
Att: 41 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Subject-Matter Jurisdiction
Friday, May 31, 2019
12 12 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/31 3:37 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Ryan Bollman. Directing attorney Ryan Bollman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
11 11 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/31 3:34 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting4 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Phillippe Lieberman. Directing attorney Phillippe Lieberman to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
10 10 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Fri 05/31 3:22 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting3 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Alan J. Kluger. Directing attorney Alan J. Kluger to register online for CM/ECF at http://www.mdd.uscourts.gov/electronic-case-filing-registration. Signed by Clerk on 5/31/2019. (srd, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
9 9 service Summons Issued Fri 05/31 2:38 PM
Summons Issued 21 days as to 8057 Ritchie Highway, LLC, 9400 Liberty Limited Partnership, A&I Realty LLLP, Ant Car Wash LLC, Antoy LLC, David G. Antwerpen, Jacob M. Antwerpen, Michael L. Antwerpen, Antwerpen Auto World LLC, Antwerpen Hyundai, Inc., Antwerpen Motorcars Ltd., Antwerpen Nissan, Inc., Antwerpen Volkswagen, Inc., Antwerpen-HK, Inc., J.A. Motorcars, Inc., Tricaz III Properties, LLC.(jb5, Deputy Clerk)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
8 8 misc Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement Thu 05/30 1:50 PM
Local Rule 103.3 Disclosure Statement by Atlantic MD AG, LLC, Atlantic MD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD H, LLC, Clarksville AMD N, LLC, Clarksville AMD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD T, LLC, Owings Mills AMD N, LLC, Pasadena AMD RE, LLC, Pasadena AMD V, LLC, Pike AMD C, LLC, Pike AMD H, LLC, Randallstown AMD RE, LLC, Woodlawn AMD N, LLC, Woodlawn AMD RE, LLC(Carrier, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A
7 7 notice Notice of Filing Exhibit or Attachment Under Seal Thu 05/30 11:41 AM
-SEALED - NOTICE of Filing Under Seal Sealed Exhibits A, B, C, D to Complaint by Atlantic MD AG, LLC, Atlantic MD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD H, LLC, Clarksville AMD N, LLC, Clarksville AMD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD T, LLC, Owings Mills AMD N, LLC, Pasadena AMD RE, LLC, Pasadena AMD V, LLC, Pike AMD C, LLC, Pike AMD H, LLC, Randallstown AMD RE, LLC, Woodlawn AMD N, LLC, Woodlawn AMD RE, LLC re1 Complaint,,,,(Carrier, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit B,
Att: 2 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit C,
Att: 3 Exhibit Sealed Exhibit D
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
6 6 notice Notice (Other) Wed 05/29 12:48 PM
NOTICE by Atlantic MD AG, LLC, Atlantic MD RE, LLC re1 Complaint,,,, Summonses (Carrier, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, May 28, 2019
5 5 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/28 3:19 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Ryan Bollman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8036212.) by Atlantic MD AG, LLC, Atlantic MD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD H, LLC, Clarksville AMD N, LLC, Clarksville AMD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD T, LLC, Owings Mills AMD N, LLC, Pasadena AMD RE, LLC, Pasadena AMD V, LLC, Pike AMD C, LLC, Pike AMD H, LLC, Pike and RE, LLC, Randallstown AMD RE, LLC, Woodlawn AMD N, LLC, Woodlawn AMD RE, LLC(Carrier, William)
Related: [-]
4 4 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/28 3:11 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Philippe Lieberman (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8036121.) by Atlantic MD AG, LLC, Atlantic MD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD H, LLC, Clarksville AMD N, LLC, Clarksville AMD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD T, LLC, Owings Mills AMD N, LLC, Pasadena AMD RE, LLC, Pasadena AMD V, LLC, Pike AMD C, LLC, Pike AMD H, LLC, Pike and RE, LLC, Randallstown AMD RE, LLC, Woodlawn AMD N, LLC, Woodlawn AMD RE, LLC(Carrier, William)
Related: [-]
3 3 motion Pro Hac Vice Tue 05/28 2:55 PM
MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Alan J. Kluger (Filing fee $100, receipt number 0416-8036021.) by Atlantic MD AG, LLC, Atlantic MD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD H, LLC, Clarksville AMD N, LLC, Clarksville AMD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD T, LLC, Owings Mills AMD N, LLC, Pasadena AMD RE, LLC, Pasadena AMD V, LLC, Pike AMD C, LLC, Pike AMD H, LLC, Pike and RE, LLC, Randallstown AMD RE, LLC, Woodlawn AMD N, LLC, Woodlawn AMD RE, LLC(Carrier, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2019
2 2 motion Seal Fri 05/24 3:39 PM
MOTION to Seal Exhibits A, B, C and D to the Complaint by Atlantic MD AG, LLC, Atlantic MD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD H, LLC, Clarksville AMD N, LLC, Clarksville AMD RE, LLC, Clarksville AMD T, LLC, Owings Mills AMD N, LLC, Pasadena AMD RE, LLC, Pasadena AMD V, LLC, Pike AMD C, LLC, Pike AMD H, LLC, Pike and RE, LLC, Randallstown AMD RE, LLC, Woodlawn AMD N, LLC, Woodlawn AMD RE, LLC(Carrier, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/24 3:28 PM
COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-8033354.), filed by Clarksville AMD RE, LLC, Pasadena AMD V, LLC, Atlantic MD RE, LLC, Atlantic MD AG, LLC, Pike and RE, LLC, Owings Mills AMD N, LLC, Clarksville AMD H, LLC, Pike AMD H, LLC, Pasadena AMD RE, LLC, Randallstown AMD RE, LLC, Woodlawn AMD RE, LLC, Pike AMD C, LLC, Clarksville AMD N, LLC, Woodlawn AMD N, LLC, Clarksville AMD T, LLC.(Carrier, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Exhibit A Notice of Filing Under Seal,
Att: 3 Exhibit B Notice of Filing Under Seal,
Att: 4 Exhibit C Notice of Filing Under Seal,
Att: 5 Exhibit D Notice of Filing Under Seal,
Att: 6 Exhibit E,
Att: 7 Exhibit F,
Att: 8 Summons Ant Car Wash,
Att: 9 Summons 8057 Ritchie Highway,
Att: 10 Summons 9400 Liberty,
Att: 11 Summons A&I Realty,
Att: 12 Summons Antoy LLC,
Att: 13 Summons Autoworld,
Att: 14 Summons Antwerpen HK,
Att: 15 Summons Antwerpen Hyundai,
Att: 16 Summons David Antwerpen,
Att: 17 Summons Jacob Antwerpen,
Att: 18 Summons Michael Antwerpen,
Att: 19 Summons JA Motor Cars,
Att: 20 Summons Antwerpen Motor Cars,
Att: 21 Summons Antwerpen Nissan,
Att: 22 Summons Antwerpen Tricaz,
Att: 23 Summons Antwerpen VW