Iron Maiden Holdings Limited v. 3D Realms Entertainment ApS
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Dale S Fischer |
Referred: | Jacqueline Chooljian |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-04606 |
Nature of Suit | 840 Property Rights - Trademark |
Cause | 15:1114 Trademark Infringement |
Case Filed: | May 28, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 08, 2019 |
Last checked: Sunday Nov 24, 2019 2:01 AM PST |
Defendant
3D Realms Entertainment ApS
|
|
Plaintiff
Iron Maiden Holdings Limited
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/25/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Voluntary Dismissal of a Case (Pursuant to FRCP 41a (1))
Tue 10/08 1:33 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Iron Maiden Holdings Limited. Dismissal is with prejudice. (Feinswog, Kenneth) |
|
Friday, September 20, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
1
pgs
order
Order to Show Cause
Fri 09/20 1:38 PM
ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE DISMISSAL(IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re Dismissal for Lack of Prosecution by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Response to Order to Show Cause due by 10/11/2019. (rfi) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
order
Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only
Wed 05/29 3:29 PM
STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi) |
|
6 | 6
adr
Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form
Wed 05/29 3:26 PM
NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Assignment to United States Judges (CV-18) - optional html form
Wed 05/29 3:26 PM
NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (car) |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
misc
Corporate Disclosure Statement
Tue 05/28 2:01 PM
CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Iron Maiden Holdings Limited identifying Iron Maiden Holdings Limited as Corporate Parent. (Feinswog, Kenneth) |
|
3 | 3
misc
Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)
Tue 05/28 1:57 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Iron Maiden Holdings Limited. (Feinswog, Kenneth) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Exhibit (non-trial)
Tue 05/28 1:57 PM
EXHIBIT Filed filed by Plaintiff Iron Maiden Holdings Limited. as to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)1 . (Feinswog, Kenneth) |
|
1 | 1
20
pgs
cmp
Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening)
Tue 05/28 1:54 PM
COMPLAINT Receipt No: 0973-23812134 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Iron Maiden Holdings Limited. (Attorney Kenneth A Feinswog added to party Iron Maiden Holdings Limited(pty:pla))(Feinswog, Kenneth) |