Miner v. ITT Educational Services, Inc. et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Lead BK case is: 1:16-bk-07207
Indiana Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | James M Carr |
Case #: | 1:19-ap-50105 |
Nature of Suit | 2 Bankruptcy - Other 14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
ITT Educational Services, Inc. et al
Rubin & Levin 135 N. Pennsylvania Street Suite 1400
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Sean Miner
Attn: Julian Hammond 1829 Reisterstown Road Suite 410
Baltimore, MD 21208 |
Represented By
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of U.S. Trustee 101 W. Ohio St.. Ste. 1000
Indianapolis, IN 46204 |
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 1:06 PM EDT |
Tuesday, April 13, 2021 | ||
18 | 18
court
Close Adversary Proceeding
Tue 04/13 11:49 AM
Adversary Proceeding Closed. (lak) |
|
Monday, April 05, 2021 | ||
17 | 17
notice
Dismissal Stipulation re: Adversary Proceeding, Party or Count
Mon 04/05 9:52 AM
Joint Stipulation of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding filed by Julian Ari Hammond, James E Rossow Jr. on behalf of Defendant Deborah J Caruso Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of, Plaintiff Sean Miner. (Rossow, James) |
|
Monday, August 19, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
misc
Mediator's Connections, Affidavit Disclosing
Mon 08/19 9:54 AM
Affidavit Disclosing Mediator's Connections filed by Julian Ari Hammond, Joshua W. Casselman on behalf of Defendant Deborah J Caruso Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of . (Casselman, Joshua) |
|
15 | 15
misc
Mediator, Notice of Selection of
Mon 08/19 9:52 AM
Joint Notice of Selection of Mediator Honorable Steven Rhodes , filed by Julian Ari Hammond, Joshua W. Casselman on behalf of Defendant Deborah J Caruso Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of. (Casselman, Joshua) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
order
Refer to Medition, Order on Motion to
Wed 08/14 9:00 AM
Order Granting Motion to Refer to Mediation . Notice of Selection of Mediator or Motion to Select Panel of Mediator Candidates due by 8/28/2019. Attorney for Defendant Deborah J Caruso Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of must distribute this order. (jam) |
|
Wednesday, July 24, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
motion
Mediation, Motion to Refer to
Wed 07/24 12:54 PM
Motion to Refer to Mediation filed by Joshua W. Casselman on behalf of Defendant Deborah J Caruso Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of . (Casselman, Joshua) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/08 3:12 PM
Answer to Amended Complaint filed by Joshua W. Casselman on behalf of Defendant Deborah J Caruso Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of . (Casselman, Joshua) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Appearance
Mon 06/24 12:56 PM
Appearance filed by Jill B. Bienstock on behalf of Interested Parties Shawna Admire, David Heumann, Plaintiff Sean Miner. (Bienstock, Jill) |
|
Wednesday, June 19, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
cmp
Summons Certificate of Service
Wed 06/19 12:43 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons re: James E. Russow, Jr . (Hammond, Julian) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Appearance
Tue 06/11 9:12 AM
Appearance filed by Joshua W. Casselman on behalf of Defendant Deborah J Caruso Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of. (Casselman, Joshua) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Appearance
Tue 06/11 9:10 AM
Appearance filed by James E Rossow Jr. on behalf of Defendant Deborah J Caruso Chapter 7 Trustee for the Bankruptcy Estate of. (Rossow, James) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
court
Summons Issued - Original/Alias
Fri 06/07 2:03 PM
Summons Issued. Attorney for Plaintiff must serve the summons and a copy of the complaint on parties pursuant to Fed.R.Bankr.P. 7004. Service to be completed by 06/14/2019 . A certificate of service must be filed with the Court by 06/21/2019 . Adversary Answer due by 7/8/2019. (lak) |
|
6 | 6
misc
Amended Complaint
Fri 06/07 1:24 PM
Amended Complaint (party added), filed by Julian Ari Hammond on behalf of Plaintiff Sean Miner . (Hammond, Julian) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Appearance
Fri 06/07 12:31 PM
Appearance filed by Gary H Leibowitz on behalf of Interested Parties Shawna Admire, David Heumann, Plaintiff Sean Miner. (Leibowitz, Gary) |
|
4 | 4
notice
Appearance
Fri 06/07 9:41 AM
Appearance filed by Julian Ari Hammond on behalf of Plaintiff Sean Miner. (Hammond, Julian) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
court
Deficiency Notice - Adversary Proceeding
Thu 05/30 12:10 PM
Deficiency Notice Issued re: Complaint . Appearance pursuant to Local Rule B-9010-1 due by 06/12/2019. (lak) |
|
2 | 2
court
Consent Language Notice
Thu 05/30 12:09 PM
Notice re: Consent Language . An amended document must be filed by 06/13/2019. (lak) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint
Wed 05/29 12:57 PM
Adversary case[LINK 19-50105 . Complaint filed by Plaintiff(s) Sean Miner against Defendant(s) ITT Educational Services, Inc. et al [14 ], [02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))]. (Hammond, Julian) |