Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01557
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 29, 2019
Case in other court:Kansas, 2:19-cv-02214
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2019 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Plaintiff
JEREMY MORGAN
Represented By
RICHARD M PAUL, III
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info
ASHLEA SCHWARZ
Paul Llp - Kansas City Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
7 7 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 10/29 9:08 AM
Short Form AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JEREMY MORGAN. (PAUL, RICHARD)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
6 6 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 05/29 1:59 PM
Case transferred in from District of Kansas; Case Number 2:19-cv-02214. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
5 5 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/29 10:53 AM
TRANSFER ORDER. Case electronically transferred to the Northern District of Florida (MDL 2885). ***Terminating Case. (hw) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Monday, May 13, 2019
4 4 ORDER OF RECUSAL. District Judge Carlos Murguia recused. Case reassigned to Chief District Judge Julie A. Robinson for all further proceedings. Signed by District Judge Carlos Murguia on 5/13/2019. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (jsh) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 02, 2019
3 3 DESIGNATION OF PLACE OF TRIAL filed by Plaintiff Jeremy Morgan - trial to be held in Kansas City. (Paul, Richard) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Plaintiff Jeremy Morgan. (Paul, Richard) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT with trial location of Kansas City ( Filing fee $400, Internet Payment Receipt Number AKSDC-4795710.), filed by Jeremy Morgan.(Paul, Richard) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
NOTICE OF JUDGE ASSIGNMENT: Case assigned to District Judge Carlos Murguia and Magistrate Judge Teresa J. James for all proceedings. (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry.) (ca) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
SUMMONS ISSUED as to 3M Company, Aearo Technologies LLC. (issued to Attorney for service) (This is a TEXT ENTRY ONLY. There is no.pdf document associated with this entry) (ca) [Transferred from Kansas on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]