Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01559
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 29, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-01300
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2019 5:16 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
EDMON AKHTEEBO
Represented By
DANIEL ROBERT SEIDMAN
Seidman Margulis & Fairman Llp - Belleville Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 1 hours ago
Thursday, October 24, 2019
11 11 misc Docket Annotation Thu 10/24 3:47 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Please add additional defendants when filing any future Amended Complaint/Master Short Form Complaints Re10 Amended Complaint filed by EDMON AKHTEEBO. Clerk will add additional parties. (djb)
Related: [-]
10 10 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 10/24 11:46 AM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by EDMON AKHTEEBO. (SEIDMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 12:14 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL ROBERT SEIDMAN on behalf of EDMON AKHTEEBO (SEIDMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
8 8 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 05/29 2:46 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION AND #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (djb)
Related: [-]
7 7 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 05/29 2:44 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-01300. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
6 6 2 pgs order Order Wed 05/29 10:28 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-13) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 17, 2019
4 4 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aero Technologies, LLC. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Paul A. Magnuson per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Hildy Bowbeer. Please use case number 19-cv-1300 PAM/HB. (MMG) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 16, 2019
2 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel R. Seidman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6879508 filed by Edmon Akhteebo. (Hansen, Nathan) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aero Technologies, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6879462) filed by Edmon Akhteebo. Filer requests summons issued. (Hansen, Nathan) [Transferred from Minnesota on 5/29/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet