HORNE v 3M COMPANY et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885
Florida Northern District Court | |
Judge: | M Casey Rodgers |
Referred: | Gary R Jones |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-01560 |
Nature of Suit | 365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Maryland, 8:19-cv-01295 |
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2019 4:12 AM EST |
Defendant
3M COMPANY
|
|
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
ALAN HORNE
9263 Rock Lynn Circle
Waldorf, MD 20603 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/30/2023 11:59 PM EDT |
Tuesday, October 29, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Docket Annotation
Tue 10/29 2:18 PM
DOCKET ANNOTATION BY COURT: Notice to Filer - When filing future short form complaints please add the additional defendants that are listed on the master short form complaint. Clerk will add defendants. (djb) |
|
13 | 13
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 10/29 12:47 PM
Short Form AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by ALAN HORNE. (MOODY, WILLARD) |
|
Friday, June 21, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Appearance
Fri 06/21 11:31 AM
NOTICE of Appearance by WILLARD J MOODY, JR on behalf of ALAN HORNE (MOODY, WILLARD) |
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options
Wed 05/29 3:05 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION AND #1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT. (djb) |
|
10 | 10
transfer
Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY)
Wed 05/29 3:01 PM
Case transferred in from District of Maryland; Case Number 8:19-cv-01295. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |
|
9 | 9
2
pgs
order
Order
Wed 05/29 1:45 PM
MDL Certified Transfer ORDER. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel on 5/29/2019. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) |
|
Case electronically transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Florida (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/29/2019.] | ||
misc
Staff Notes - Private
Wed 05/29 1:47 PM
Case electronically transferred to the USDC for the Northern District of Florida (km4s, Deputy Clerk) |
||
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 Summons Issued 21 days as to 3M Company and Aearo Technologies, LLC. (km4s, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/29/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Summons | ||
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 NOTICE by Alan Horne re1 Complaint Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service - Aearo Technologies, LLC (Thompson, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/29/2019.] | |
6 | 6 NOTICE by Alan Horne re1 Complaint Notice of Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service - 3M Company (Thompson, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/29/2019.] | |
5 | 5 NOTICE by Alan Horne re1 Complaint Summons - Aearo Technologies, LLC (Thompson, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/29/2019.] | |
4 | 4 NOTICE by Alan Horne re1 Complaint Summons - 3M Company (Thompson, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/29/2019.] | |
Friday, May 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 LETTER ORDER regarding the Filing of Motions. Signed by Judge Paul W. Grimm on 5/3/2019. (td, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/29/2019.] | |
2 | 2 QC NOTICE regarding:1 Complaint filed by Alan Horne. ***The following attachments are missing - Summonses. To correct this problem, please file Summonses using the event Notice (Other) and link Summonses to 1 Complaint. (td, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/29/2019.] | |
Thursday, May 02, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0416-7987571.), filed by Alan Horne.(Thompson, Nicholas) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/29/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
Case Assigned to Judge Paul W. Grimm. (ko, Deputy Clerk) [Transferred from Maryland on 5/29/2019.] |