California Central District Court
Judge:Andre Birotte Jr
Referred: Alka Sagar
Case #: 2:19-cv-04659
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause47:0227 Violation of Telephone Consumer Protection Act
Case Filed:May 29, 2019
Terminated:Nov 25, 2020
Last checked: Monday Nov 25, 2019 12:45 AM PST
Defendant
AmeriSave Mortgage Corporation
Represented By
Rebecca J Wahlquist
Snell And Wilmer LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Plaintiff
Terry Fabricant
Represented By
Todd M Friedman
Law Office Of Todd M Friedman PC
contact info
Adrian Robert Bacon
Law Offices Of Todd M Friedman PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 11 hours ago
Wednesday, November 25, 2020
53 53 order Settlement Attorney Fees Wed 11/25 6:40 PM
ORDER GRANTING FINAL APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT AND ENTERING JUDGMENT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement48 and Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Incentive Award49 , it is ORDERED, ADJUDGED AND DECREED that the Court finds that the Settlement Class is properly certified as a class for settlement purposes only. The Settlement is hereby finally approved in all respects, and the Parties are hereby directed to implement and consummate the Settlement Agreement according to its terms and provisions. The Court hereby approves the payment of a Service Award to Plaintiffs, in the amount of $5,000 to Plaintiff for his role as a Class Representative. The Court approves the payment of attorneys' fees to Class Counsel in the sum of $1,250,000. The Court also approves the reimbursement of litigation expenses in the sum of $30,061.51. The Court approves and orders payment in an amount commensurate with P&N Consulting's actual costs, and not to exceed $1,550,000.00 to P&N Consulting for performance of its settlement claims administration services. Upon the Effective Date, all Settlement Class Members shall be and are hereby permanently barred and enjoined from the institution or prosecution of any and all Released Claims that are released under the terms of the Settlement. This Lawsuit and all claims of Plaintiffs and the Settlement Class Members are hereby dismissed with prejudice. Furthermore, Plaintiffs and all Settlement Class Members are hereby barred and permanently enjoined. This Judgment is intended to be a final disposition of the action in its entirety and is intended to be immediately appealable. See document for further details. (gk)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 20, 2020
52 52 minutes Motion Hearing Settlement Attorney Fees Mon 11/23 7:44 AM
MINUTES OF Motion Hearing held before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. RE: Plaintiff's Motion for Final Approval of Class Settlement48 ; Plaintiff's Motion for Attorneys' Fees and Costs and Incentive Award49 . The Court having carefully considered the papers and the evidence submitted by the parties, and having heard the oral argument of counsel, hereby takes the motions under submission. Court Reporter: Chia Mei Jui. (gk)
Related: [-]