Sarasota County, Florida v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45339 |
Nature of Suit | 367 Torts - Personal Injury - Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury/Product Liability |
Cause | 28:1331 Fed. Question |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Florida Middle, 8:19-cv-01083 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:37 PM EST |
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Orlando FL Distribution
|
|
Defendant
CVS Vero FL Distribution LLC
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals, L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Insys Therapeutics
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Jannsen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
TEVA Pharmaceuticals USA Inc
3411 Silverside Road
Wilmington, DE 19180 |
|
Defendant
The Purdue Frederick Company Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Sarasota County, Florida
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:48 PM EDT |
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 191 pgs COMPLAINT Demand for Jury Trial against Sarasota County, Florida with Jury Demand (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 113A-15431813) filed by Sarasota County, Florida .(Pearce, David) Modified on 5/7/2019 (BES). [Transferred from flmd on 5/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet | ||
2 | 2 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington and Magistrate Judge Amanda Arnold Sansone. New case number: 8:19-cv-1083-T-33AAS. (SJB) [Transferred from flmd on 5/30/2019.] | |
Tuesday, May 07, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Sarasota County, Florida. (Pearce, David) [Transferred from flmd on 5/30/2019.] | |
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
4 | 4 SUMMONS issued as to Amerisourcebergen Drug Corporation, Cardinal Health, Inc., Cephalon, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Insys Therapeutics, Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc., Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Mallickrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc, Mallinckrodt PLC, Mallinckrodt, LLC, McKesson Corporation, Ortho-McNeil-Jannsen Pharmaceuticals, Inc., Purdue Pharma L.P., Purdue Pharma, Inc., SpecGx LLC, Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc., The Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., Walgreens Boots Alliance. (BES) [Transferred from flmd on 5/30/2019.] | |
5 | 5 RELATED CASE ORDER AND NOTICE of designation under Local Rule 3.05 - track 2. Signed by Judge Virginia M. Hernandez Covington on 5/8/2019. (TWL) [Transferred from flmd on 5/30/2019.] | |
6 | 6 ORDER: Plaintiff is directed to effect service of process as required by Rule 4, Fed. R. Civ. P., and file proof thereof with the Court as soon as service has been effected. See Order for details.(TWL) [Transferred from flmd on 5/30/2019.] | |
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 MULTIDISTRICT LITIGATION panel order transferring case to: Northern District of Ohio re MDL case number: 2804. (AG) [Transferred from flmd on 5/30/2019.] | |
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
8 | 8 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Middle. Case number 8:19-cv-01083. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |