Granville County v. AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45342 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2019 |
Case in other court: | North Carolina Eastern, 5:19-cv-00202 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:37 PM EST |
Defendant
Omnicare Distribution Center, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
CVS Health Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Eckerd Corporation
|
|
Defendant
KVK-Tech, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Mylan Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
781 Chestnut Ridge Road
Morgantown, WV 26505 |
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical Companies, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Par Pharmaceutical, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Rite Aid of Maryland, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Sandoz, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Specgx, LLC
|
|
Defendant
The North Carolina Mutual Wholesale Drug Company
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walmart, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Plaintiff
Granville County
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:49 PM EDT |
Thursday, May 09, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 166 pgs COMPLAINT against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0417-4939699.), filed by Granville County. (Coates, Paul) [Transferred from nced on 5/30/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit CIVIL COVERSHEET ADDENDUM | ||
Friday, May 10, 2019 | ||
Notice to Counsel - No summons provided for issuance or Waiver of Service filed. (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 5/30/2019.] | ||
Notice to Counsel - Counsel should file a Notice of Appearance pursuant to Local Civil Rule 5.2(a). (Rudd, D.) [Transferred from nced on 5/30/2019.] | ||
Friday, May 24, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 Document: Email of Text Order from John W. Nichols, Clerk of MDL Panel regarding MDL No. 2804 advising our court of the conditional transfer order filed by the Panel and inasmuch as no objection is pending at this time, the stay is lifted. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 5/30/2019.] | |
3 | 3 Document: Text Minute Order. As stipulated in Rule 7.1(c) of the Rules of Procedure of the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, transmittal of the order has been stayed 7 days to give any party an opportunity to oppose the transfer. The 7-day period has now elapsed, no opposition was received, and the order is directed to the Clerk of the United States District Court for the N.D. Ohio for filing. The Panel governing statute, 28 U.S.C. 1407, requires that the transferee clerk transmit a certified copy of the Panel order to transfer to the clerk of the district court from which the action is being transferred. Signed by Clerk of the Panel John W. Nichols on 5/24/2019. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 5/30/2019.] | |
4 | 4 CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER - Pursuant to Rule 7.1 of the Rules of Procedure of the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, the action(s) on the attached schedule are transferred under 28 U.S.C. § 1407 to the Northern District of Ohio for the reasons stated in the order of December 5, 2017, and, with the consent of that court, assigned to the Honorable Dan A. Polster. Signed by John W. Nichols, Clerk of the Panel. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 5/30/2019.] | |
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
Case transferred to District of Ohio Northern. File transmitted electronically via email through CM/ECF to InterdistrictTransfer OHND@ohnd.uscourts.gov per instructions of receiving court. (Collins, S.) [Transferred from nced on 5/30/2019.] | ||
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of North Carolina Eastern. Case number 5:19-cv-00202. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |