Meeker County, Minnesota v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45343 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Minnesota, 0:19-cv-01211 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:37 PM EST |
Defendant
Allergan USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Kadian LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories FL, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Florida
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Laboratories UT, Inc., f/k/a Watson Laboratories, Inc.-Salt Lake City
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Mid Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Pharma, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharma, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Actavis South Atlantic LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Totowa LLC
874 Walker Road, Suite C
Dover, DE 19904 |
|
Defendant
Allergan Finance, LLC f/k/a Actavis, Inc. f/k/a Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC f/k/a Actavis PLC f/k/a Allergan, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Allergan Sales, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis Elizabeth LLC
|
|
Defendant
H.D. Smith Wholesale Drug Co.
|
|
Defendant
Jonathan D. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Kathe A. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Rhodes Pharmaceuticals L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Richard S. Sackler
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceutical Industries Ltd.
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-Mart Pharmacy Warehouse
|
|
Defendant
Wal-Mart Stores East, LP dba Wal-mart Pharmacy Warehouse #45
|
|
Defendant
Warner Chilcott Company, LLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Jane Does, 1-50
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt Brand Pharmaceuticals, Inc
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc., The
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
SpecGX LLC
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Walgreens Boots Alliance, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Meeker County, Minnesota
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 5:02 PM EDT |
Monday, May 06, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Wednesday, May 08, 2019 | ||
2 | 2 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd, 4th - Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-1211 (MJD/ECW). (KNK) [Transferred from mnd on 5/30/2019.] | |
3 | 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Linda Singer and Elizabeth Smith as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (KNK) [Transferred from mnd on 5/30/2019.] | |
4 | 4
![]() |
|
5 | 5
![]() |
|
Tuesday, May 28, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() |