Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Gregcoh LLC
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03502 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gregcoh LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 2 hours ago |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/26 3:09 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3502 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:02 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 06/12 1:56 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal /Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:05 AM
Summons Service Executed on Gregcoh LLC 6/3/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Saturday, June 01, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 06/01 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/01/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Thu 05/30 12:52 PM
Summons Issued on Gregcoh LLC Date Issued 5/30/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Thu 05/30 6:00 AM
|
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 05/29 1:10 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Gregcoh LLC. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Wed 05/29 1:10 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 05/29 1:08 PM
Adversary case 19-03502 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Gregcoh LLC. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |