Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Facility Response Group Incorporated
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03503 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 05, 2022 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Facility Response Group Incorporated
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:03 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, January 05, 2022 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 01/05 3:07 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3503 Closed. (emiller) |
||
Friday, August 20, 2021 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 08/20 2:17 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal /Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, April 21, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Wed 04/21 2:50 PM
Notice of Cancellation of Hearing . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice
Fri 04/02 3:05 PM
Notice of Hearing . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
court
Certificate of Notice
Fri 04/02 12:30 PM
Certificate of Email Notice. Contacted Ben Wallen. Movant to notice all interested parties and file a certificate of service with the court Hearing scheduled for 4/28/2021 at 11:30 AM at telephone and video conference. (aalo) |
||
Wednesday, December 04, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
motion
Default Judgment
Wed 12/04 2:35 PM
Motion for Default Judgment. Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 06/07 1:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on Facility Response Group Incorporated 6/3/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Saturday, June 01, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 06/01 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/01/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Thu 05/30 12:55 PM
Summons Issued on Facility Response Group Incorporated Date Issued 5/30/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Thu 05/30 6:00 AM
|
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 05/29 1:44 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Facility Response Group Incorporated. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Wed 05/29 1:43 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 05/29 1:42 PM
Adversary case 19-03503 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Facility Response Group Incorporated. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |