Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Universal McCann Worldwide, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03505 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 29, 2019 |
Terminated: | Oct 06, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Universal McCann Worldwide, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 5 hours ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:04 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, October 06, 2021 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 10/06 10:58 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3505 Closed. (aalo) |
||
Wednesday, July 28, 2021 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Wed 07/28 10:33 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding /Notice Of Stipulation Of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Of Adversary Proceeding By And Between Plaintiff And Defendant Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Thursday, August 29, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 08/29 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/29/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Monday, August 26, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
order
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 08/26 5:32 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice - Michael Austria Signed on 8/26/2019. (aalo) |
|
Tuesday, July 16, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
misc
Certificate
Tue 07/16 3:13 PM
Certificate of Service (Filed By Universal McCann Worldwide, Inc. ) (Rodriguez, Jason) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Mon 07/01 10:40 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice Matthew P. Austria, Austria Legal, LLC . Filed by Universal McCann Worldwide, Inc. (Rodriguez, Jason) |
|
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Mon 07/01 10:33 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Universal McCann Worldwide, Inc. (Rodriguez, Jason) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:17 AM
Summons Service Executed on Universal McCann Worldwide, Inc. 6/3/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Saturday, June 01, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 06/01 11:50 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/01/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Thu 05/30 1:02 PM
Summons Issued on Universal McCann Worldwide, Inc. Date Issued 5/30/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Thu 05/30 6:00 AM
|
|
Wednesday, May 29, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Wed 05/29 1:53 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Universal McCann Worldwide, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Wed 05/29 1:52 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Wed 05/29 1:51 PM
Adversary case 19-03505 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Universal McCann Worldwide, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |