Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03510 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 14 minutes ago |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/26 3:25 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3510 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:05 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, June 17, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 06/17 6:00 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 31, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/31 10:15 AM
Answer to Complaint , Answer to Complaint Filed by Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corporation (Hoffman, Matthew) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice
Wed 07/31 10:13 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Matthew Hoffman Filed by on behalf of Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corporation (Hoffman, Matthew) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Thu 06/27 2:45 PM
Notice of Stipulation by and between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:13 AM
Summons Service Executed on Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corporation 6/3/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Sunday, June 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 06/02 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/02/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Fri 05/31 9:22 AM
Summons Issued on Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corporation Date Issued 5/31/2019. (SarahShelby) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Fri 05/31 6:00 AM
|
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 05/30 12:18 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corporation. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Thu 05/30 12:17 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 05/30 12:16 PM
Adversary case 19-03510 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Simon Roofing and Sheet Metal Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/30 1:19 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-03510 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21173062. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |