Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. CFP Fire Protection, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03511 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 26, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
CFP Fire Protection, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Friday, January 26, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Fri 01/26 3:26 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3511 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:05 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Monday, February 03, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice
Mon 02/03 11:55 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Monday, December 09, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice
Mon 12/09 12:16 PM
Notice of Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice
Tue 11/05 2:51 PM
Notice of Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Thursday, October 03, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Thu 10/03 11:06 AM
Notice of Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 07, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice
Wed 08/07 2:15 PM
Notice of Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Mon 06/17 6:39 PM
Notice Of Stipulation By And Between The Trustee And Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Fri 06/07 1:32 PM
Summons Service Executed on CFP Fire Protection, Inc. 6/3/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Sunday, June 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 06/02 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/02/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Fri 05/31 9:24 AM
Summons Issued on CFP Fire Protection, Inc. Date Issued 5/31/2019. (SarahShelby) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Fri 05/31 6:00 AM
|
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 05/30 12:30 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on CFP Fire Protection, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Thu 05/30 12:29 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 05/30 12:28 PM
Adversary case 19-03511 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against CFP Fire Protection, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/30 1:19 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-03511 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21173062. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |