Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Shore Point Distributing Company, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03512 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 30, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Shore Point Distributing Company, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/30 10:30 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3512 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:06 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Friday, March 06, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 03/06 11:27 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, January 22, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice
Wed 01/22 12:29 PM
Notice of Fourth Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Fri 10/25 3:01 PM
Notice of Third Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, August 30, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice
Fri 08/30 2:34 PM
Notice of Second Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 09, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Tue 07/09 1:35 PM
Notice Of Stipulation By And Between The Trustee And Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:12 AM
Summons Service Executed on Shore Point Distributing Company, Inc. 6/3/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Sunday, June 02, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sun 06/02 11:49 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/02/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Fri 05/31 9:25 AM
Summons Issued on Shore Point Distributing Company, Inc. Date Issued 5/31/2019. (SarahShelby) |
|
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Fri 05/31 6:00 AM
|
|
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Thu 05/30 12:46 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Shore Point Distributing Company, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Thu 05/30 12:45 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Thu 05/30 12:45 PM
Adversary case 19-03512 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Shore Point Distributing Company, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
none
Thu 05/30 1:19 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-03512 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21173062. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |