Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Beth Bloom
Referred: Lauren Fleischer Louis
Case #: 1:19-cv-22212
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
Cause28:1331 Federal Question
Case Filed:May 30, 2019
Terminated:Oct 15, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2019 3:56 AM EST
Defendant
Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC
Represented By
Charles Martin Rosenberg
Carlton Fields, P.A.
contact info
Charles Woodward Throckmorton, V
Carlton Fields
contact info
Aaron Stenzler Weiss
Carlton Fields, P.A.
contact info
Mediator
Rodney A. Max
Plaintiff
Stuart Sawyer
Represented By
Alexander H. Burke
Burke Law Offices, LLC
contact info
William Peerce Howard
The Consumer Protection Firm, PLLC
contact info

GPO Sep 03 2020
ORDER granting 31 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Award. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
GPO Sep 03 2020
ORDER granting 33 Granting Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)

Docket last updated: 38 minutes ago
Friday, September 04, 2020
39 39 order Judgment Fri 09/04 10:19 AM
FINAL JUDGMENT. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 03, 2020
38 38 8 pgs order Order on Motion to Certify Class Thu 09/03 4:08 PM
ORDER granting33 Granting Final Approval Of Class Action Settlement. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
37 37 4 pgs order Order on Motion for Attorney Fees Thu 09/03 4:05 PM
ORDER granting31 Motion for Attorneys' Fees, Expenses, and Incentive Award. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 9/3/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
36 36 notice Notice (Other) Thu 09/03 1:16 PM
NOTICE of Filing Declaration by Stuart Sawyer re33 Unopposed MOTION to Certify Class Final Approval of Class Action Settlement (Howard, William) Modified text on 9/3/2020 (kpe)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Affidavit Declaration
Wednesday, September 02, 2020
35 35 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 09/02 2:29 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER re33 Unopposed Motion for Final Approval of Class Action Settlement. As discussed on the record yesterday, the parties are ordered to file a notice regarding the two individuals who requested to be excluded from the class-wide settlement. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (ks01)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 01, 2020
34 34 minutes Fairness Hearing Tue 09/01 11:44 AM
PAPERLESS Minute Entry for proceedings held before Judge Beth Bloom: Fairness Hearing held on 9/1/2020. Total time in court: 1 hour(s) : 15 minutes. Attorney Appearance(s): Charles Woodward Throckmorton, V, Aaron Stenzler Weiss, Alexander H. Burke, & William Peerce Howard. Court Reporter: Yvette Hernandez, 305-523-5698 / Yvette_Hernandez@flsd.uscourts.gov. (ks01)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 12, 2020
33 33 motion Certify Class Wed 08/12 7:34 PM
Unopposed MOTION to Certify Class Final Approval of Class Action Settlement by Stuart Sawyer. Responses due by 8/26/2020(Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit Proposed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Proposed Judgment
Monday, June 08, 2020
32 32 notice Certificate of Counsel Mon 06/08 4:30 PM
CERTIFICATE of Counsel re31 Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Incentive Award by William Peerce Howard on behalf of Stuart Sawyer (Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 03, 2020
31 31 motion Attorney Fees Wed 06/03 7:13 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION for Attorney Fees Expenses and Incentive Award by Stuart Sawyer. Responses due by 6/17/2020(Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration (Burke),
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration (Howard)
Friday, March 20, 2020
30 30 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Settlement Fri 03/20 9:22 AM
ORDER granting29 Unopposed Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement. Final Approval Hearing set for 9/1/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 3/20/2020. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 18, 2020
29 29 motion Settlement Wed 03/18 1:53 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Settlement PRELIMINARY APPROVAL OF CLASS ACTION SETTLEMENT by Stuart Sawyer. Responses due by 4/1/2020(Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration,
Att: 2 Exhibit Settlement Agreement,
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration
Tuesday, October 15, 2019
28 28 order Administrative Order Tue 10/15 10:47 AM
ORDER Administratively Closing Case. Any scheduled hearings are CANCELED,all pending motions are DENIED as moot, and all deadlines are TERMINATED. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 10/11/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 11, 2019
27 27 notice Notice of Settlement - aty Fri 10/11 11:04 AM
NOTICE of Settlement by Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC (Weiss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
26 26 adr Mediation Report Fri 10/11 9:19 AM
FINAL MEDIATION REPORT by Rodney A. Max. Disposition: Settled in full.(Max, Rodney)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2019
25 25 order Order on Motion for Leave to File Tue 10/01 11:34 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting ECF No.24 Plaintiff's Unopposed Motion for Leave to Attend Mediation by Telephone. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom. (ks01)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
24 24 motion Leave to File Document Mon 09/30 3:40 PM
Unopposed MOTION for Leave to File Attend Mediation by Telephone by Stuart Sawyer.(Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Friday, September 13, 2019
23 23 11 pgs order Order on Motion for Protective Order Fri 09/13 4:22 PM
ORDER granting20 Joint Motion for Entry of Confidentiality and Protective Order and Fed. R. Civ. Evid. 502(D) Order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 9/13/2019. See attached document for full details. (agn)
Related: [-]
22 22 order Order on Motion to Stay Fri 09/13 1:16 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting in part and denying in part21 Motion to Stay. The Court's Scheduling Order, ECF No.15 , is amended as follows: By October 31, 2019, the Parties shall exchange expert witness summaries or reports on issues of class certification. By November 14, 2019, the parties shall exchange rebuttal expert witness summaries or reports on issues of class certification. All other deadlines remain in place. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
Related: [-]
21 21 motion Stay Fri 09/13 9:36 AM
Joint MOTION to Stay re15 Scheduling Order,,,,, Order Referring Case to Mediation,,,,, Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge,,,, by Stuart Sawyer. Responses due by 9/27/2019 (Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 10, 2019
20 20 motion Protective Order Tue 09/10 4:54 PM
Joint MOTION for Protective Order pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(c) and Fed. R. Evid. 502(d) by Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC.(Weiss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 12, 2019
19 19 1 pgs order Order Scheduling Mediation Mon 08/12 9:35 AM
ORDER Scheduling Mediation before Rodney A. Max. Mediation Hearing set for 10/7/2019 09:00 AM. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 8/9/2019. See attached document for full details. (ar2)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2019
18 18 adr Notice of Mediator Selection and/or Hearing Fri 08/09 12:37 PM
NOTICE of Mediator Selection and Hearing. Added Rodney A. Max. Mediation Hearing set for 10/07/2019 at 9;00 a.m..(Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Monday, August 05, 2019
17 17 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Mon 08/05 9:23 AM
Corporate Disclosure Statement by Stuart Sawyer (Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
16 16 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Wed 07/24 9:00 AM
GENERAL ORDER ON DISCOVERY OBJECTIONS AND PROCEDURES. Signed by Magistrate Judge Lauren Fleischer Louis on 7/24/2019. See attached document for full details. (aw)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 22, 2019
15 15 order Scheduling Order Order Referring Case to Mediation Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge Mon 07/22 9:50 AM
ORDER SETTING TRIAL AND PRE-TRIAL SCHEDULE, REQUIRING MEDIATION, AND REFERRING CERTAIN MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: ( Amended Pleadings due by 9/17/2019., Discovery due by 6/30/2020., Expert Discovery due by 6/30/2020., Joinder of Parties due by 9/17/2019., Mediation Deadline 7/14/2020., In Limine Motions due by 7/22/2020., Dispositive Motions due by 7/22/2020., Motions due by 7/22/2020., Pretrial Stipulation due by 10/12/2020., Jury Trial set for 10/26/2020 09:00 AM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom., Calendar Call set for 10/20/2020 01:45 PM in Miami Division before Judge Beth Bloom.) ( Mediation Deadline 7/14/2020.) Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/19/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 19, 2019
14 14 misc Scheduling Report - Rule 26(f)/16.1 Fri 07/19 4:19 PM
Joint SCHEDULING REPORT - Rule 16.1 by Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC(Throckmorton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Ex. A - Proposed Scheduling Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Ex. B - Non-Election to Magistrate
13 13 misc Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement Fri 07/19 3:55 PM
Certificate of Other Affiliates/Corporate Disclosure Statement by Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC identifying Corporate Parent International Money Express, Inc., Other Affiliate Carlton Fields, P.A., Other Affiliate Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC, Other Affiliate International Money Express Sub 2, LLC, Other Affiliate Intermex Holdings, Inc., Other Affiliate Intermex Wire Transfer Corp., Other Affiliate Intermex Wire Transfer II, LLC, Other Affiliate Intermex Transfers de Mexico S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Intermex Wire Transfer de Mexico S.A. de C.V., Other Affiliate Intermex Wire Transfers de Guatemala S.A., Other Affiliate Intermex Servicios Integrales S. de R.L. de C.V., Other Affiliate Intermex Central de Servicios S. de R.L. de C.V. for Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC (Throckmorton, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 08, 2019
12 12 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 07/08 3:58 PM
ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to Complaint with Jury Demand by Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC. (Weiss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
11 11 service Summons (Affidavit) Returned Executed Tue 07/02 12:18 PM
SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Stuart Sawyer. Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC served on 6/17/2019, answer due 7/8/2019. (Howard, William)
Related: [-]
10 10 order - Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached) Tue 07/02 12:08 PM
ORDER TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 7/2/2019. See attached document for full details. (kpe)
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Mon 07/01 10:49 AM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Aaron Stenzler Weiss on behalf of Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC. Attorney Aaron Stenzler Weiss added to party Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC(pty:dft). (Weiss, Aaron)
Related: [-]
Friday, June 28, 2019
8 8 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 06/28 3:50 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Woodward Throckmorton, V on behalf of Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC. Attorney Charles Woodward Throckmorton, V added to party Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC(pty:dft). (Throckmorton, Charles)
Related: [-]
7 7 notice Notice of Attorney Appearance Fri 06/28 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Charles Martin Rosenberg on behalf of Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC. Attorney Charles Martin Rosenberg added to party Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC(pty:dft). (Rosenberg, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 10, 2019
6 6 order Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/10 4:08 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER granting5 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Attorney Alexander H. Burke. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom (BB)
Related: [-]
5 5 motion Appear Pro Hac Vice Mon 06/10 3:53 PM
Plaintiff's MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice, Consent to Designation, and Request to Electronically Receive Notices of Electronic Filing for Alexander H. Burke. Filing Fee $ 75.00 Receipt # 113C-11717290 by Stuart Sawyer. Responses due by 6/24/2019 (Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
4 4 6 pgs order Order Requiring Joint Scheduling Report Fri 05/31 10:41 AM
Order Requiring Scheduling Report and Certificates of Interested Parties. Signed by Judge Beth Bloom on 5/31/2019. See attached document for full details. (ls)
Related: [-]
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 05/31 6:42 AM
Summons Issued as to Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC. (bb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 30, 2019
2 2 order Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent Fri 05/31 6:36 AM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Judge Beth Bloom. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Lauren F. Louis is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (bb)
Related: [-]
1 1 11 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 05/30 5:04 PM
COMPLAINT (Class Action) against Intermex Wire Transfer, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11688705, filed by Stuart Sawyer.(Howard, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Summon(s)