California Central District Court
Judge:Philip S Gutierrez
Referred: John E Mcdermott
Case #: 5:19-cv-00996
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause28:1441 Notice of Removal - Employment Discrimination
Case Filed:May 30, 2019
Terminated:May 02, 2023
Case in other court:Riverside County Superior Court, RIC1902519
Last checked: Tuesday Nov 26, 2019 1:06 AM PST
Defendant
Louis Cox
Represented By
Shaun M Murphy
Slovak Baron Empey Murphy And Pinkney LLP
contact info
Quynhvi B Sotelo
Slovak Baron Ewmpey Murphy And Pinkney LLP
contact info
Katelyn K Empey
Slovak Baron Empey Murphy And Pinkney LLP
contact info
Defendant
LDC Distribution, LLC
Represented By
Shaun M Murphy
Slovak Baron Empey Murphy And Pinkney LLP
contact info
Quynhvi B Sotelo
Slovak Baron Ewmpey Murphy And Pinkney LLP
contact info
Katelyn K Empey
Slovak Baron Empey Murphy And Pinkney LLP
contact info
Defendant
Does
Defendant
Gannett Publishing Services, LLC
Represented By
Bethany A Pelliconi
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Richard Burk Lapp
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Paul J Leaf
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Camille A Olson
Seyfarth Shaw LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Vicky Aronson
Represented By
James M Treglio
Potter Handy LLP
contact info
Mark D Potter
Center For Disability Access
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/04/2025 11:59 PM PDT
Thursday, June 15, 2023
83 83 judgmentCV Judgment Fri 06/16 3:06 PM
JUDGMENT RE: APPROVAL OF PAGA SETTLEMENT by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. Final Judgment is hereby entered in the Action, including with respect to the Released Claims of all Aggrieved Individuals, and each of their respective executors, administrators, representatives, agents, heirs, successors, assigns, trustees, spouses, or guardians. All claims in the Action, including the Released Claims, are hereby dismissed in their entirety with prejudice with each side to bear its own costs and attorneys fees, except as provided by the Settlement and the Courts orders. Entry by the Clerk of the Court of this Order and Final Judgment is hereby directed. (See document for further details) (yl)
Related: [-]