Florida Southern District Court
Judge:Alicia O Valle
Referred: Alicia O Valle
Case #: 0:19-cv-61361
Nature of Suit442 Civil Rights - Employment
Cause42:1981 Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 31, 2019
Terminated:Nov 30, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 27, 2019 4:10 AM EST
Defendant
Femwell Group Health, Inc.
Represented By
Merry Ellen Lindberg
Ford & Harrison, LLP
contact info
Defendant
MS PEO II, LLC.
Represented By
Merry Ellen Lindberg
Ford & Harrison, LLP
contact info
Defendant
Miami Heart Wellness, LLC
Represented By
Merry Ellen Lindberg
Ford & Harrison, LLP
contact info
Defendant
TCM PEO V, LLC
Represented By
Merry Ellen Lindberg
Ford & Harrison, LLP
contact info
Defendant
VitalMD Group Holding, LLC
Represented By
Merry Ellen Lindberg
Ford & Harrison, LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nyrva Germain
Represented By
Anthony Maximillien Georges-Pierre
Remer & Georges-Pierre, PLLC
contact info
Max Lloyd Horowitz
Remer & Georges-Pierre PLLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Tuesday, January 05, 2021
83 83 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Tue 01/05 5:12 PM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Alicia O. Valle on 1/5/2021. See attached document for full details. (dpr)
Related: [-]