Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Inland Fresh Seafood Corporation of America, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03514 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Inland Fresh Seafood Corporation of America, Inc. d/b/a Inland Seafood
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 39 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/30 10:32 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3514 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:06 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Friday, July 19, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 07/19 11:28 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:25 AM
Summons Service Executed on Inland Fresh Seafood Corporation of America, Inc. d/b/a Inland Seafood 6/5/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/06 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Tue 06/04 10:55 AM
Summons Issued on Inland Fresh Seafood Corporation of America, Inc. d/b/a Inland Seafood Date Issued 6/4/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
Saturday, June 01, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Sat 06/01 6:00 AM
|
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Fri 05/31 8:05 AM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Inland Fresh Seafood Corporation of America, Inc. d/b/a Inland Seafood. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Fri 05/31 8:04 AM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Fri 05/31 8:02 AM
Adversary case 19-03514 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Inland Fresh Seafood Corporation of America, Inc. d/b/a Inland Seafood. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |