Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Wirtz Beverage Illinois LLC et al
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03516 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Wirtz Beverage Illinois LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Breakthru Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC, F/K/A Wirtz Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC
|
Represented By
Breakthru Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC, F/K/A Wirtz Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC
contact info |
Defendant
Wirtz Beverage Minnesota Wine & Spirits, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wirtz Beverage Nevada Reno, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Wirtz Beverage Nevada Beer, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 4 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/30 10:33 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3516 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:06 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, November 20, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 11/20 11:22 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, October 18, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice
Fri 10/18 11:44 AM
Notice of Fifth Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, September 17, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice
Tue 09/17 1:37 PM
Notice of Fourth Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Wed 08/28 12:12 PM
Notice of Third Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Thursday, August 15, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice
Thu 08/15 10:40 AM
Notice of Second Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 26, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Wed 06/26 10:14 AM
Notice Of Stipulation By And Between The Trustee And Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:32 AM
Summons Service Executed on Breakthru Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC, F/K/A Wirtz Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC 6/5/2019; Wirtz Beverage Illinois LLC 6/5/2019; Wirtz Beverage Minnesota Wine & Spirits, Inc. 6/5/2019; Wirtz Beverage Nevada Beer, Inc. 6/5/2019; Wirtz Beverage Nevada Reno, Inc. 6/5/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/06 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Tue 06/04 11:01 AM
Summons Issued on Breakthru Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC, F/K/A Wirtz Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC Date Issued 6/4/2019; Wirtz Beverage Illinois LLC Date Issued 6/4/2019; Wirtz Beverage Minnesota Wine & Spirits, Inc. Date Issued 6/4/2019; Wirtz Beverage Nevada Beer, Inc. Date Issued 6/4/2019; Wirtz Beverage Nevada Reno, Inc. Date Issued 6/4/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
Saturday, June 01, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Sat 06/01 6:00 AM
|
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Fri 05/31 12:28 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Wirtz Beverage Illinois LLC, Breakthru Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC, F/K/A Wirtz Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC, Wirtz Beverage Minnesota Wine & Spirits, Inc., Wirtz Beverage Nevada Reno, Inc., Wirtz Beverage Nevada Beer, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Fri 05/31 12:26 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Fri 05/31 12:26 PM
Adversary case 19-03516 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Wirtz Beverage Illinois LLC, Breakthru Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC, F/K/A Wirtz Beverage Illinois Belleville, LLC, Wirtz Beverage Minnesota Wine & Spirits, Inc., Wirtz Beverage Nevada Reno, Inc., Wirtz Beverage Nevada Beer, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |