Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Net Star Telecommunications, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03520 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2019 |
Terminated: | Mar 27, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Net Star Telecommunications, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Wednesday, March 27, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 03/27 5:32 PM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3520 Closed. (rgs4) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:08 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Friday, April 02, 2021 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Fri 04/02 10:51 AM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding /Notice Of Stipulation Of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice Of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Monday, July 08, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
misc
Statement
Mon 07/08 9:48 AM
Statement Rule 7.1 Disclosure (Filed By Net Star Telecommunications, Inc. ). (Boyd, Walter) |
|
Saturday, July 06, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Sat 07/06 4:16 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Net Star Telecommunications, Inc. (Boyd, Walter) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:26 AM
Summons Service Executed on Net Star Telecommunications, Inc. 6/5/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/06 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Tue 06/04 11:14 AM
Summons Issued on Net Star Telecommunications, Inc. Date Issued 6/4/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
Saturday, June 01, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Sat 06/01 6:00 AM
|
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Fri 05/31 12:53 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Net Star Telecommunications, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Fri 05/31 12:50 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Fri 05/31 12:49 PM
Adversary case 19-03520 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Net Star Telecommunications, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |