Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01604
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Case Filed:May 31, 2019
Terminated:Oct 09, 2019
Last checked: Wednesday Nov 27, 2019 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Plaintiff
GABRIELLE ARELLANO
Represented By
ERIC D HOLLAND
Holland Groves Schneller Etc - St Louis Mo
contact info
Plaintiff
REMEDIAZ ARELLANO
Represented By
ERIC D HOLLAND
Holland Groves Schneller Etc - St Louis Mo
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 09, 2019
7 7 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 10/09 9:31 AM
CLERK'S DISMISSAL re6 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice (djb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2019
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/08 3:36 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GABRIELLE ARELLANO, REMEDIAZ ARELLANO (CROMPTON, RANDALL)
Related: [-]
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/08 12:57 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by GABRIELLE ARELLANO, REMEDIAZ ARELLANO (CROMPTON, RANDALL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 12, 2019
4 4 service Affidavit of Service Wed 06/12 9:22 AM
AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons served on Christina Olund on 06/07/2019, filed by GABRIELLE ARELLANO, REMEDIAZ ARELLANO. (CROMPTON, RANDALL)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Mon 06/03 9:31 AM
Summons Issued as to 3M COMPANY. (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
2 2 misc Civil Cover Sheet Fri 05/31 1:17 PM
CIVIL COVER SHEET. (HOLLAND, ERIC)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 05/31 1:14 PM
COMPLAINT Arellano, Remediaz against 3M COMPANY ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number AFLNDC-4506955.), filed by REMEDIAZ ARELLANO, GABRIELLE ARELLANO. (HOLLAND, ERIC)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 SUMMONS FOR 3M
utility Add and Terminate Judges Fri 05/31 3:17 PM
MAGISTRATE JUDGE GARY R JONES added. MAGISTRATE JUDGE ELIZABETH M TIMOTHY no longer assigned to case. (djb)
Related: [-]