Orange County Indiana v. Purdue Pharma L.P. et al
Consolidated
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Lead case: 1:17-md-02804
Ohio Northern District Court | |
Judge: | Dan Aaron Polster |
Case #: | 1:19-op-45356 |
Nature of Suit | 470 Other Statutes - Racketeer Influenced and Corrupt Organizations |
Cause | 18:1961 Racketeering (RICO) Act |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2019 |
Case in other court: | Indiana Southern, 4:19-cv-00103 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 08, 2019 7:38 PM EST |
Defendant
Mallinckrodt PLC
|
|
Defendant
Watson Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Watson Laboratories Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Pharmaceuticals USA, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Teva Phamaceutical Industries Ltd
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma L.P.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Pharma Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Purdue Frederick Company, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Ortho-McNeil-Janssen Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Noramco Inc
|
|
Defendant
McKesson Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Mallinckrodt LLC
|
|
Defendant
Johnson & Johnson
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Janssen Pharmaceutica Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Pharmaceuticals Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Endo Health Solutions Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cephalon Inc.
|
|
Defendant
Cardinal Health Inc.
|
|
Defendant
AmerisourceBergen Drug Corporation
|
|
Defendant
Allergan PLC
|
|
Defendant
Actavis LLC
|
|
Plaintiff
Orange County, Indiana
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 06/24/2019 4:54 PM EDT |
Monday, May 13, 2019 | ||
1 | 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0756-5427809)(Pierce, Kenneth) [Transferred from insd on 5/31/2019.] | |
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet Cover Sheet, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Summons Summons | ||
2 | 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kenneth C. Pierce, II on behalf of Plaintiff ORANGE COUNTY INDIANA. (Pierce, Kenneth) [Transferred from insd on 5/31/2019.] | |
Tuesday, May 14, 2019 | ||
3 | 3 Summons Issued as to ACTAVIS LLC, AMERISOURCEBERGEN DRUG CORPORATION, CARDINAL HEALTH INC., ENDO PHARMACEUTICALS INC., JANSSEN PHARMACEUTICALS, INC, MALLINCKRODT LLC, MCKESSON CORPORATION, PURDUE PHARMA L.P., PURDUE PHARMA, INC., TEVA PHARMACEUTICAL INDUSTRIES, LTD. (MAT) [Transferred from insd on 5/31/2019.] | |
4 | 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE's NOTICE of Availability to Exercise Jurisdiction issued. (MAT) [Transferred from insd on 5/31/2019.] | |
Thursday, May 30, 2019 | ||
5 | 5 CLOSED TRANSFER to the United States District Court for the Northern District of Ohio IN RE: NATIONAL PRESCRIPTION OPIATE LITIGATION MDL NO 2804 Per Certified Transfer Order #94. (CKM) [Transferred from insd on 5/31/2019.] | |
6 | 6 Transfer Letter to Clerk of the Northern District of Ohio. Case transferred electronically to Northern District of Ohio, on 5/30/2019. IN RE MDL 2804 CTO 94 (CKM) [Transferred from insd on 5/31/2019.] | |
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
7 | 7 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Indiana Southern. Case number 4:19-cv-00103. Original file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received. |