Andriulli et al v. Danone North America, LLC
New York Southern District Court | |
Judge: | Vincent L Briccetti |
Case #: | 7:19-cv-05165 |
Nature of Suit | 370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud |
Cause | 28:1332fr Diversity-Fraud |
Case Filed: | Jun 02, 2019 |
Terminated: | Apr 13, 2020 |
Last checked: Friday Nov 29, 2019 3:33 AM EST |
Defendant
Danone North America, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Theresa Andriulli
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Jane Doe
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Bradley Dejong
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 03/26/2024 11:59 PM EDT |
Wednesday, April 29, 2020 | ||
37 | 37
misc
Stipulation of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 04/29 4:53 PM
STIPULATION OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL It is hereby stipulated and agreed by and between the parties and/or their respective counsel(s) that the above-captioned action is voluntarily dismissed, with prejudice against the defendant(s) Danone North America, LLC, Danone US, LLC and without costs pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Document filed by Theresa Andriulli, Bradley Dejong, Jane Doe. Proposed document to be reviewed and processed by Clerk's Office staff (No action required by chambers). ..(Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Monday, April 13, 2020 | ||
36 | 36
1
pgs
order
Order of Dismissal ~Util - Set Deadlines ~Util - Terminate Motions
Tue 04/14 10:01 AM
ORDER OF DISMISSAL: The Court has been advised that the parties have settled this case. Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that this action is dismissed as without costs, and without prejudice to the right to restore the action to the Courts calendar, provided the application to restore the action is made by no later than May 13, 2020. To be clear, any application to restore the action must be filed by May 13, 2020, and any application to restore the action filed thereafter may be denied solely on the basis that it is untimely. All scheduled conferences or other scheduled court appearances are cancelled. Any pending motions are moot. The Clerk is instructed to terminate the letter motion (Doc. #35) and close this case. SO ORDERED. (Motions due by 5/13/2020.) Motions terminated:35 JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference adjournment sine die of the Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for April 24, 2020 addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Spencer Sheehan dated April 13, 2020. filed by Theresa Andriulli, Jane Doe, Bradley Dejong. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 4/13/2020) (mml) |
|
35 | 35
motion
Adjourn Conference
Mon 04/13 4:24 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Adjourn Conference adjournment sine die of the Initial Pretrial Conference currently scheduled for April 24, 2020 addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Spencer Sheehan dated April 13, 2020. Document filed by Theresa Andriulli, Bradley Dejong, Jane Doe..(Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Wednesday, April 01, 2020 | ||
34 | 34
order
Order
Wed 04/01 2:30 PM
ORDER: At the time of the scheduled conference on 4/24/2020, counsel shall use the following information to connect by telephone: Dial-In Number: (888) 363-4749 (toll free) or (215) 446-3662; Access Code: 1703567. By 4/22/2020, at 5:00 p.m., counsel shall file on the ECF docket their proposed Civil Case Discovery Plan and Scheduling Order. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti) (Text Only Order) (Scheinman, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, January 28, 2020 | ||
33 | 33
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Tue 01/28 2:17 PM
ORDER granting32 Letter Motion to Continue: The conference scheduled for 2/6/2020, is adjourned to 4/24/2020, at 9:30 a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (srs) |
|
32 | 32
motion
Continue
Tue 01/28 2:00 PM
JOINT LETTER MOTION to Continue Initial Pretrial Conference scheduled for Feb. 6, 2020 addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Angel A. Garganta dated January 28, 2020. Document filed by Danone US, LLC.(Garganta, Angel) |
|
Friday, December 20, 2019 | ||
31 | 31
order
Order on Motion to Continue
Fri 12/20 8:58 AM
ORDER granting30 Letter Motion to Continue: The initial conference scheduled for 1/22/2020, is adjourned to 2/6/2020, at 10:30 a.m. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (srs) |
|
Thursday, December 19, 2019 | ||
30 | 30
motion
Continue
Thu 12/19 6:32 PM
LETTER MOTION to Continue the Initial Pretrial Conference addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Angel A. Garganta dated December 19, 2019. Document filed by Danone US, LLC.(Garganta, Angel) |
|
Wednesday, December 18, 2019 | ||
29 | 29
notice
Notice of Hearing
Wed 12/18 4:51 PM
NOTICE OF INITIAL CONFERENCE: Pretrial Conference set for 1/22/2020 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 620, 300 Quarropas Street, White Plains, NY 10601 before Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. (va) |
|
28 | 28
order
Stipulation and Order of Voluntary Dismissal ~Util - Add and Terminate Parties ~Util - Terminate Motions
Wed 12/18 4:48 PM
JOINT STIPULATION AND ORDER REGARDING VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT DANONE NORTH AMERICA, LLC AND SUBSTITUTION OF DANONE US, LLC: It is hereby STIPULATED and AGREED by the parties and subject to approval of the Court, that: 1. Defendant Danone North America, LLC is hereby dismissed without prejudice pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a)(1); 2. The First Amended Complaint, as filed on November 18, 2019, ECF No. 21, in the above captioned matter is hereby amended to substitute Danone US, LLC as a defendant in place of Danone North America, LLC; and 3. The First Amended Complaint's allegations concerning Danone North America, LLC shall be deemed to be directed to Danone US, LLC. The Clerk is instructed to terminate defendant Danone North America, LLC from the case and substitute in Danone US, LLC. SO ORDERED. Danone US, LLC added. Danone North America, LLC terminated. Motions terminated:25 MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Danone North America, LLC, New Party: Danone US, LLC filed by Danone North America, LLC. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 12/18/2019) (mml) |
|
Tuesday, December 17, 2019 | ||
27 | 27
order
Order on Motion to Dismiss
Tue 12/17 9:48 AM
ORDER terminating16 Motion to Dismiss: Defendant's16 motion to dismiss the complaint is terminated as moot in light of defendant's26 answer to plaintiffs'22 amended complaint. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (srs) |
|
Monday, December 16, 2019 | ||
26 | 26
answer
Answer to Amended Complaint
Mon 12/16 10:42 PM
ANSWER to22 Amended Complaint, with JURY DEMAND. Document filed by Danone North America, LLC.(Garganta, Angel) |
|
25 | 25
motion
Substitute Party
Mon 12/16 6:26 PM
MOTION to Substitute Party. Old Party: Danone North America, LLC, New Party: Danone US, LLC . Document filed by Danone North America, LLC.(Garganta, Angel) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit A, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit B | ||
Wednesday, November 27, 2019 | ||
24 | 24
order
Order on Motion for Extension of Time
Wed 11/27 9:04 AM
ORDER granting23 Letter Motion for Extension of Time: Defendant's anticipated motion to dismiss the amended complaint is due 12/16/2019. Plaintiffs' opposition to the motion is due 1/17/2020. Defendant's reply, if any, is due 2/7/2020. (HEREBY ORDERED by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti)(Text Only Order) (srs) |
|
Tuesday, November 26, 2019 | ||
23 | 23
motion
Extension of Time
Tue 11/26 7:37 PM
LETTER MOTION for Extension of Time Joint Motion to Modify Deadlines addressed to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti from Angel A. Garganta dated November 26, 2019. Document filed by Danone North America, LLC.(Garganta, Angel) |
|
Tuesday, November 19, 2019 | ||
22 | 22
25
pgs
cmp
Amended Complaint
Tue 11/19 4:05 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending21 Amended Complaint,,1 Complaint against Danone North America, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Theresa Andriulli, Bradley Dejong, Jane Doe. Related document:21 Amended Complaint,,1 Complaint.(Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Product Analysis, October 29, 2019, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter, FDA to Basa, August 22, 1979, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Letter, FDA to Brownell, April 19, 2005, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Letter, FDA to Filandro, July 9, 1991 | ||
misc
Notice to Attorney Regarding Deficient Pleading
Tue 11/19 3:49 PM
***NOTICE TO ATTORNEY REGARDING DEFICIENT PLEADING. Notice to Attorney Spencer Sheehan to RE-FILE Document No. 21 Amended Complaint. The filing is deficient for the following reason(s): the PDF attached to the docket entry for the pleading is not correct; all active parties to the case must be listed in PDF caption. Re-file the pleading using the event type Amended Complaint found under the event list Complaints and Other Initiating Documents - attach the correct signed PDF - select the individually named filer/filers - select the individually named party/parties the pleading is against. (sj) |
||
Monday, November 18, 2019 | ||
21 | 21
cmp
Amended Complaint
Mon 11/18 4:51 PM
FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT amending1 Complaint against Danone North America, LLC with JURY DEMAND.Document filed by Theresa Andriulli, Jane Doe, Bradley Dejong. Related document:1 Complaint.(Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Att: 1 Exhibit Product Analysis, October 29, 2019, | ||
Att: 2 Exhibit Letter, August 22, 1979, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Letter, April 19, 2005, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Letter, July 9, 1991 | ||
Tuesday, November 05, 2019 | ||
20 | 20
order
Memo Endorsement ~Util - Set Deadlines
Tue 11/05 12:58 PM
MEMO ENDORSEMENT on re:19 Response in Opposition to Motion filed by Theresa Andriulli, Jane Doe. ENDORSEMENT: Plaintiffs' first amended complaint shall be filed by 11/18/2019. SO ORDERED. (Amended Pleadings due by 11/18/2019.) (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 11/18/2019) (mml) |
|
Monday, November 04, 2019 | ||
19 | 19
respm
Response in Opposition to Motion
Mon 11/04 1:47 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition to Motion re:16 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion to Dismiss . Plaintiffs' Intention to Amend Pursuant to ECF Order No. 18 . Document filed by Theresa Andriulli, Jane Doe. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Monday, October 28, 2019 | ||
18 | 18
1
pgs
order
Order
Mon 10/28 5:13 PM
ORDER: Accordingly, it is hereby ORDERED that, by no later than November 4, 2019, plaintiff must notify the Court by letter, with copies simultaneously delivered to defendant's counsel, whether (i) she intends to file an amended complaint, or (ii) she will rely on the complaint that is the subject of the motion to dismiss. If plaintiff elects not to file an amended complaint, any motions to dismiss will proceed in the regular course, and the Court is unlikely to grant plaintiff a further opportunity to amend to address the purported deficiencies made apparent by the fully briefed arguments in defendant's motion. (And as further set forth herein.) SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/28/2019) (jca) |
|
Friday, October 25, 2019 | ||
17 | 17
29
pgs
respm
Memorandum of Law in Support of Motion
Fri 10/25 4:27 PM
MEMORANDUM OF LAW in Support re:16 MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion to Dismiss . Memorandum of Law In Support of Danone North America, LLC's Motion to Dismiss . Document filed by Danone North America, LLC. (Garganta, Angel) |
|
16 | 16
motion
Dismiss
Fri 10/25 4:25 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Notice of Motion to Dismiss . Document filed by Danone North America, LLC. Responses due by 11/8/2019(Garganta, Angel) |
|
15 | 15
notice
Notice (Other)
Fri 10/25 4:09 PM
NOTICE of Motion to Dismiss re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Danone North America, LLC. (Garganta, Angel) |
|
Tuesday, October 22, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/22 3:50 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting12 Motion for Amit Rana to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. SO ORDERED. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/22/2019) (mml) |
|
13 | 13
1
pgs
order
Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 10/22 2:40 PM
ORDER FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE granting11 Motion for Angel A. Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that applicant is admitted to practice Pro Hac Vice in the above-captioned case in the United States District Court for the Southern District of New York. All attorneys appearing before this court are subject to the Local Rules of this Court, including the Rules governing discipline of attorneys. (Signed by Judge Vincent L. Briccetti on 10/22/2019) (mml) |
|
misc
Notice Regarding Pro Hac Vice Motion
Tue 10/22 8:38 AM
>>>NOTICE REGARDING PRO HAC VICE MOTION. Regarding Document No. 12 MOTION for Amit Rana to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17809063. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff., 11 MOTION for Angel Antonio Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17808861. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff.. The document has been reviewed and there are no deficiencies. (wb) |
||
Monday, October 21, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/21 6:50 PM
MOTION for Amit Rana to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17809063. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Danone North America, LLC.(Rana, Amit) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Amit Rana In Support of Motion to Admit Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Amit Rana) | ||
11 | 11
motion
Appear Pro Hac Vice
Mon 10/21 6:39 PM
MOTION for Angel Antonio Garganta to Appear Pro Hac Vice . Filing fee $ 200.00, receipt number ANYSDC-17808861. Motion and supporting papers to be reviewed by Clerk's Office staff. Document filed by Danone North America, LLC.(Garganta, Angel) |
|
Att: 1 Affidavit of Angel A. Garganta In Support of Motion to Admit Counsel Pro Hac Vice, | ||
Att: 2 Text of Proposed Order Order for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Angel A. Garganta) | ||
10 | 10
misc
Rule 7.1 Corporate Disclosure Statement
Mon 10/21 3:53 PM
RULE 7.1 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT. Identifying Corporate Parent Danone S.A. for Danone North America, LLC. Document filed by Danone North America, LLC.(Gabriel, Elise) |
|
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 10/21 3:49 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Elise Margaret Gabriel on behalf of Danone North America, LLC. (Gabriel, Elise) |
|
Saturday, September 07, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice of Change of Address
Sat 09/07 11:29 PM
NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS by George Volney Granade on behalf of Theresa Andriulli, Jane Doe. New Address: Reese LLP, 8484 Wilshire Boulevard, Suite 515, Los Angeles, California, United States 90211, (212) 643-0500. (Granade, George) |
|
Tuesday, August 27, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
service
Waiver of Service Executed
Tue 08/27 10:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED. Danone North America, LLC waiver sent on 8/26/2019, answer due 10/25/2019. Document filed by Theresa Andriulli; Jane Doe. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/03 2:10 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by George Volney Granade on behalf of Theresa Andriulli, Jane Doe. (Granade, George) |
|
5 | 5
notice
Notice of Appearance
Mon 06/03 2:07 PM
NOTICE OF APPEARANCE by Michael Robert Reese on behalf of Theresa Andriulli, Jane Doe. |
|
4 | 4
service
Summons Issued
Mon 06/03 11:13 AM
ELECTRONIC SUMMONS ISSUED as to Danone North America, LLC. (dnh) |
|
notice
Case Opening Initial Assignment Notice
Mon 06/03 11:07 AM
CASE OPENING INITIAL ASSIGNMENT NOTICE: The above-entitled action is assigned to Judge Vincent L. Briccetti. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned District Judge, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/judges/District] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. Please download and review the ECF Rules and Instructions, located at[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/ecf_filing.php] . (dnh) |
||
utility
Case Designation
Mon 06/03 11:08 AM
Magistrate Judge Lisa M. Smith is so designated. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1) parties are notified that they may consent to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge. Parties who wish to consent may access the necessary form at the following link:[LINK:http://nysd.uscourts.gov/forms.php] . (dnh) |
||
utility
Case Designated ECF
Mon 06/03 11:08 AM
Case Designated ECF. (dnh) |
||
Sunday, June 02, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
service
Request for Issuance of Summons
Sun 06/02 7:43 AM
REQUEST FOR ISSUANCE OF SUMMONS as to Danone North America, LLC, re:1 Complaint. Document filed by Theresa Andriulli, Jane Doe. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Civil Cover Sheet
Sun 06/02 7:35 AM
CIVIL COVER SHEET filed. (Sheehan, Spencer) |
|
1 | 1
19
pgs
cmp
Complaint
Sun 06/02 7:31 AM
COMPLAINT against Danone North America, LLC. (Filing Fee $ 400.00, Receipt Number ANYSDC-17000859)Document filed by Theresa Andriulli, Jane Doe.(Sheehan, Spencer) |