Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11240

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Laurie Selber Silverstein
Case #: 1:19-bk-11244
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2019
Terminated:Jan 09, 2020

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors10,001-25,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Florists' Transworld Delivery, Inc.
3113 Woodcreek Dr
Downers Grove, IL 60515-5412
Represented By
Daniel J. DeFranceschi
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 4 minutes ago
Tuesday, July 27, 2021
9 9 claims Withdrawal of Claim-Chapter 11 Tue 07/27 10:53 AM
Withdrawal of Claim . Filed by New York Department Of Labor. (BJM)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2020
court Close Bankruptcy Case Thu 01/09 8:05 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LB)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
8 8 6 pgs order Order Wed 01/08 1:16 PM
Order Closing the Subsidiary Cases Signed on 1/8/2020 (CMB)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2019
7 7 4 pgs order Order Fri 09/13 1:20 PM
Order Approving Case Caption Change. An order has been entered in this case directing that the caption of this case be changed, in accordance with the name change of Florists' Transworld Delivery, Inc. to GUE Liquidation Delivery, Inc. Order Signed on 9/13/2019. (BA)
Related: [-]
Saturday, July 13, 2019
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Sat 07/13 7:32 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Florists' Transworld Delivery, Inc.. (Silveira, Sarah)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Sat 07/13 7:31 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Florists' Transworld Delivery, Inc.. (Silveira, Sarah)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
4 4 order Order-Joint Admin Tue 06/04 3:06 PM
Order Granting Motion of the Debtors for an Order Directing the Joint Administration of Their Chapter 11 Cases Related [+] Order Signed on 6/4/2019. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of FTD Companies, Inc., Bloom That, Inc., Florists' Transworld Delivery, Inc., FlowerFarm, Inc., FSC Denver LLC, FSC Phoenix LLC, FTD, Inc., FTD.CA, Inc., FTD.COM Inc., FTD Group, Inc., FTD Mobile, Inc., Giftco, LLC, Provide Cards, Inc., Provide Commerce LLC, and Provide Creations, Inc. The docket of FTD Companies, Inc., Case No. 19-11240 LSS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (LJJ)
Related: [-] 2
Monday, June 03, 2019
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 06/03 3:06 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-11244 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 9328626, amount $1717.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 19 pgs motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Mon 06/03 2:04 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Bloom That, Inc., FSC Denver LLC, FSC Phoenix LLC, FTD Companies, Inc., FTD Group, Inc., FTD Mobile, Inc., FTD, Inc., FTD.CA, Inc., FTD.COM Inc., Florists' Transworld Delivery, Inc., FlowerFarm, Inc., Giftco, LLC, Provide Cards, Inc., Provide Commerce LLC, Provide Creations, Inc.. (DeFranceschi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
1 1 29 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 06/03 1:28 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by Florists' Transworld Delivery, Inc.. (DeFranceschi, Daniel)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 06/03 7:44 AM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (LB)
Related: [-]