FSC Phoenix LLC
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11240
Lead case is: 1:19-bk-11240
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | Laurie Selber Silverstein |
Case #: | 1:19-bk-11249 |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 09, 2020 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 10,001-25,000 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
FSC Phoenix LLC
3113 Woodcreek Dr
Downers Grove, IL 60515-5412 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 13 minutes ago |
Thursday, January 09, 2020 | ||
court
Close Bankruptcy Case
Thu 01/09 8:08 AM
Bankruptcy Case Closed (LB) |
||
Wednesday, January 08, 2020 | ||
7 | 7
![]() Order Closing the Subsidiary Cases Signed on 1/8/2020 (CMB) |
|
Saturday, July 13, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by FSC Phoenix LLC. (Silveira, Sarah) |
|
5 | 5
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by FSC Phoenix LLC. (Silveira, Sarah) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Order Granting Motion of the Debtors for an Order Directing the Joint Administration of Their Chapter 11 Cases Order Signed on 6/4/2019. An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of FTD Companies, Inc., Bloom That, Inc., Florists' Transworld Delivery, Inc., FlowerFarm, Inc., FSC Denver LLC, FSC Phoenix LLC, FTD, Inc., FTD.CA, Inc., FTD.COM Inc., FTD Group, Inc., FTD Mobile, Inc., Giftco, LLC, Provide Cards, Inc., Provide Commerce LLC, and Provide Creations, Inc. The docket of FTD Companies, Inc., Case No. 19-11240 LSS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case. (LJJ) |
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Mon 06/03 9:34 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) 19-11249 [misc,volp11a] (1717.00). Receipt Number 91719, amount $1717.00. (COH) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Bloom That, Inc., FSC Denver LLC, FSC Phoenix LLC, FTD Companies, Inc., FTD Group, Inc., FTD Mobile, Inc., FTD, Inc., FTD.CA, Inc., FTD.COM Inc., Florists' Transworld Delivery, Inc., FlowerFarm, Inc., Giftco, LLC, Provide Cards, Inc., Provide Commerce LLC, Provide Creations, Inc.. (DeFranceschi, Daniel) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1717. Filed by FSC Phoenix LLC. (DeFranceschi, Daniel) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 06/03 7:44 AM
Judge Laurie Selber Silverstein added to case (LB) |