New York Eastern District Court
Judge:Nicholas G Garaufis
Referred: Cheryl L Pollak
Case #: 1:19-cv-03284
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Breach of Contract
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2019
Terminated:Mar 29, 2023
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2019 4:33 AM EST
Defendant
C. Joy Family Properties, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Ruderman
Cyruli Shanks & Zizmor LLP
contact info
Defendant
Carol Joy Family Properities, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Ruderman
Cyruli Shanks & Zizmor LLP
contact info
Defendant
Nemet Motors, LLC
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Ruderman
Cyruli Shanks & Zizmor LLP
contact info
Defendant
Scott Perlstein
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Ruderman
Cyruli Shanks & Zizmor LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Nissan Motor Acceptance Corporation
Represented By
Salvatore A. Giampiccolo
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Michael Rato
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter LLP
contact info

GPO Jul 22 2020
MEMORANDUM & ORDER, Defendant Nemet Motors, LLC's (Dkt. 25) Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's conversion claim is GRANTED. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 7/21/2020. (Lee, Tiffeny)
GPO Sep 29 2022
MEMORANDUM & ORDER, Nissan's motion for partial summary judgment on the Fourth Count, for foreclosure, is GRANTED. Nissan is DIRECTED to submit a proposed form of judgment of foreclosure and sale, allowing for a final calculation of amountsowed after completion of discovery and resolution of the remaining claims at issue in this case, within 14 days of the entry of this order. So Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 9/29/2022. (Lee, Tiffeny)

Docket last updated: 05/23/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Wednesday, March 29, 2023
75 75 1 pgs order Order Dismissing Case Fri 03/31 9:22 AM
STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL. Ordered by Judge Nicholas G. Garaufis on 3/29/2023. (EG)
Related: [-]