Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Gabriel Holdings, LLC d/b/a Don's & Ben'
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03525 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | May 31, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Gabriel Holdings, LLC d/b/a Don's & Ben's Liquor
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Don's & Ben's, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Gabriel Investment Group, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/30 10:46 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3525 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:10 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Friday, January 24, 2020 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Fri 01/24 11:13 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal /Notice Of Voluntary Dismissal Without Prejudice Of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Tue 10/08 12:14 PM
Notice of Filing of Bankruptcy Case(s) / Suggestion of Bankruptcy . Filed by Don's & Ben's, Inc., Gabriel Holdings, LLC d/b/a Don's & Ben's Liquor, Gabriel Investment Group, Inc. (Rice, Thomas) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/02 4:29 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Gabriel Holdings, LLC d/b/a Don's & Ben's Liquor, Gabriel Investment Group, Inc. (Rice, Thomas) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Thu 06/27 2:09 PM
Notice of Stipulation by and between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:23 AM
Summons Service Executed on Don's & Ben's, Inc. 6/5/2019; Gabriel Holdings, LLC d/b/a Don's & Ben's Liquor 6/5/2019; Gabriel Investment Group, Inc. 6/5/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 06/06 12:06 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/05/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Tue 06/04 11:27 AM
Summons Issued on Don's & Ben's, Inc. Date Issued 6/4/2019; Gabriel Holdings, LLC d/b/a Don's & Ben's Liquor Date Issued 6/4/2019; Gabriel Investment Group, Inc. Date Issued 6/4/2019. (MelissaMorgan) |
|
Saturday, June 01, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Sat 06/01 6:00 AM
|
|
Friday, May 31, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Fri 05/31 2:13 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Gabriel Holdings, LLC d/b/a Don's & Ben's Liquor, Don's & Ben's, Inc., Gabriel Investment Group, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Fri 05/31 2:12 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Fri 05/31 2:11 PM
Adversary case 19-03525 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Gabriel Holdings, LLC d/b/a Don's & Ben's Liquor, Don's & Ben's, Inc., Gabriel Investment Group, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |