Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. S.S. Kemp & Co., LLC d/b/a Trimark SS Kemp and Com
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03529 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
S.S. Kemp & Co., LLC d/b/a Trimark SS Kemp and Company
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 52 minutes ago |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/30 10:47 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3529 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:11 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Wednesday, September 25, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
notice
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
Wed 09/25 3:23 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal With Prejudice of Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Wednesday, July 10, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
answer
Answer to Complaint
Wed 07/10 4:39 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by S.S. Kemp & Co., LLC d/b/a Trimark SS Kemp and Company (Wolfshohl, Joshua) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:39 AM
Summons Service Executed on S.S. Kemp & Co., LLC d/b/a Trimark SS Kemp and Company 6/6/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 06/08 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Wed 06/05 12:11 PM
Summons Issued as to S.S. Kemp & Co., LLC d/b/a Trimark SS Kemp and Company Date Issued 6/5/2019. (jdav) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Tue 06/04 6:00 AM
|
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Mon 06/03 1:09 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on S.S. Kemp & Co., LLC d/b/a Trimark SS Kemp and Company. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Mon 06/03 1:07 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 06/03 1:06 PM
Adversary case 19-03529 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against S.S. Kemp & Co., LLC d/b/a Trimark SS Kemp and Company. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |
|
crditcrd
none
Mon 06/03 1:10 PM
Receipt of Complaint 19-03529 [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 21182758. Fee amount $ 350.00. (U.S. Treasury) |