Richard Dalton v. Anovos Productions, LLC et al
California Central District Court | |
Judge: | Michael W Fitzgerald |
Referred: | Karen L Stevenson |
Case #: | 2:19-cv-04821 |
Nature of Suit | 950 Other Statutes - Constitutionality of State Statutes |
Cause | Civil Miscellaneous Case |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2019 |
Re-opened: | Apr 26, 2021 |
Terminated: | Aug 05, 2021 |
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2019 12:44 AM PST |
Defendant
Anovos Productions, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Disney Lucasfilm Ltd.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Richard Dalton
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Alexander Alonso
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Arthur Catalano
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Matthew Fernandes
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Randolph Jones
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Andre Joseph
|
Represented By
|
TERMINATED PARTIES | |
Defendant
CBS Studios, Inc.
Terminated: 11/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
NBCUniversal Media, LLC
Terminated: 11/15/2019
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/26/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Thursday, February 16, 2023 | ||
102 | 102
textonly
Text Only Scheduling Notice
Thu 02/16 1:57 PM
ORDER by Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald. On 7/14/2022, the Court extended the deadlines in its prior Order99 to 9/2/2022. The Court now ORDERS the parties to file a Joint Status Report as to the satisfaction of the stipulated judgment. The Joint Status Report shall be filed no later than 3/3/2023. IT IS SO ORDERED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smom) |