New Jersey District Court
Judge:John Michael Vazquez
Case #: 8:19-cv-13338
Nature of Suit890 Other Statutes - Other Statutory Actions
CauseCivil Miscellaneous Case
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2019
Terminated:Jul 01, 2019
Case in other court:SUPREME COURT OF NEW JERSEY, D-121-16
Last checked: Sunday Dec 01, 2019 4:01 AM EST
Notice Only
attydisc
Respondent
JAIME MERRICK KAIGH
Represented By
JAIME KAIGH
contact info


Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
2 2 order 1 - Terminate Deadlines Order Wed 07/03 10:02 AM
ORDER, that no disciplinary action be taken in this matter; and it is further Ordered that the Clerk's office shall close this matter. Signed by Judge John Michael Vazquez on 7/2/2019. (JB, )
Related: [-]
Monday, July 01, 2019
utility Terminate Civil Case Mon 07/01 8:42 PM
***Civil Miscellaneous Case Terminated. (Ti)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
1 1 utility Remark (public) Tue 06/04 2:23 PM
Copy of Order D-121-16 from the Supreme Court of New Jersey reprimanding respondent, JAIME MERRICK KAIGH. (Ti)
Related: [-]