Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. NCR Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03530 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 08, 2021 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
NCR Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 88 minutes ago |
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:12 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Friday, January 15, 2021 | ||
16 | 16
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Fri 01/15 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/15/2021. (Admin.) |
|
Friday, January 08, 2021 | ||
15 | 15
order
Dismissing Adversary Case
Wed 01/13 1:30 AM
Stipulation and Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Signed on 1/8/2021 (emiller) |
|
Tuesday, January 05, 2021 | ||
14 | 14
misc
Stipulation
Tue 01/05 2:51 PM
Stipulation By Drivetrain, LLC and Defendant NCR Corporation - Stipulation and Agreed Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice. Does this document include an agreed order or otherwise request that the judge sign a document? Yes. (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC ). (Warner, Michael) |
|
Thursday, January 16, 2020 | ||
13 | 13
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thu 01/16 11:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 01/16/2020. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, January 14, 2020 | ||
12 | 12
order
Appear pro hac vice
Tue 01/14 4:29 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice - Todd A. Atkinson Signed on 1/14/2020. (emiller) |
|
Friday, August 02, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
misc
Statement
Fri 08/02 1:20 PM
Statement // Corporate Ownership Statement (Filed By NCR Corporation ) (Klingensmith, Elizabeth) |
|
10 | 10
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Fri 08/02 10:52 AM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice of Todd A. Atkinson . Filed by NCR Corporation (Klingensmith, Elizabeth) |
|
9 | 9
answer
Answer to Complaint
Fri 08/02 10:51 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by NCR Corporation(Klingensmith, Elizabeth) |
|
Att: 1 Certificate of Service | ||
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Mon 07/01 2:40 PM
Notice of Stipulation by and between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:37 AM
Summons Service Executed on NCR Corporation 6/6/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 06/08 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Wed 06/05 12:16 PM
Summons Issued as to NCR Corporation Date Issued 6/5/2019. (jdav) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Tue 06/04 6:00 AM
|
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Mon 06/03 3:32 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on NCR Corporation. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Mon 06/03 3:31 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 06/03 3:30 PM
Adversary case 19-03530 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against NCR Corporation. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |