Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant G v. Broadspire Services, Inc.
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Lead BK case is: 4:17-bk-33550
Texas Southern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | David R Jones |
Case #: | 4:19-ap-03531 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference |
Case Filed: | Jun 03, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jan 30, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Broadspire Services, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 1 hours ago |
Tuesday, January 30, 2024 | ||
court
Close Adversary Case
Tue 01/30 10:48 AM
Adversary Case 4:19-ap-3531 Closed. (RosarioSaldana) |
||
Tuesday, October 17, 2023 | ||
court
Case Reassigned-Adversary
Tue 10/17 10:12 AM
Judge Christopher M. Lopez added to case. Involvement of Judge David R Jones Terminated. (DawnaKelly) |
||
Tuesday, October 08, 2019 | ||
16 | 16
notice
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding
Tue 10/08 2:02 PM
Notice of Stipulated Dismissal in an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Thursday, September 12, 2019 | ||
15 | 15
notice
Notice
Thu 09/12 12:09 PM
Notice of Fourth Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Saturday, September 07, 2019 | ||
14 | 14
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 09/07 11:48 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/07/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Thursday, September 05, 2019 | ||
13 | 13
order
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 09/05 3:12 PM
Order Granting Motion To Appear pro hac vice - Kevin A. Stine Signed on 9/5/2019. (emiller) |
|
Wednesday, August 28, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
notice
Notice
Wed 08/28 12:18 PM
Notice of Third Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Tuesday, July 30, 2019 | ||
11 | 11
notice
Notice
Tue 07/30 11:54 AM
Notice of Second Stipulation by and Between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
Thursday, June 27, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
notice
Notice
Thu 06/27 5:40 PM
Notice of Stipulation by and between the Trustee and Defendant . Filed by Drivetrain, LLC (Warner, Michael) |
|
9 | 9
motion
Appear pro hac vice
Thu 06/27 3:59 PM
Motion to Appear pro hac vice for Kevin A. Stine . Filed by Broadspire Services, Inc. (Ferretti, Daniel) |
|
8 | 8
notice
Notice
Thu 06/27 3:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Service of Notices and Other Documents . Filed by Broadspire Services, Inc. (Ferretti, Daniel) |
|
Tuesday, June 11, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
cmp
Summons Service Executed
Tue 06/11 10:33 AM
Summons Service Executed on Broadspire Services, Inc. 6/6/2019. (Warner, Michael) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
court
BNC Certificate of Mailing
Sat 06/08 12:16 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 06/07/2019. (Admin.) |
|
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
court
Summons Issued
Wed 06/05 1:21 PM
Summons Issued as to Broadspire Services, Inc. Date Issued 6/5/2019. (jdav) |
|
Tuesday, June 04, 2019 | ||
4 | 4
order
Judge Jones Order Regarding Exhibit and Witness Lists (Adversary)
Tue 06/04 6:00 AM
|
|
Monday, June 03, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
misc
Summons - Request for Issuance
Mon 06/03 3:36 PM
Request for Issuance of Summons on Broadspire Services, Inc.. (Warner, Michael) |
|
2 | 2
misc
Additional Attachments
Mon 06/03 3:35 PM
Additional Attachments Re: Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (Filed By Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust ) (Warner, Michael) |
|
1 | 1
cmp
Complaint [system event]
Mon 06/03 3:34 PM
Adversary case 19-03531 Nature of Suit: (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)) Complaint by Drivetrain, LLC, as Trustee of Ignite Restaurant Group GUC Trust against Broadspire Services, Inc.. Fee Amount $350 (Warner, Michael) |