Oklahoma Western District Court
Judge:Jodi W Dishman
Case #: 5:19-cv-00509
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Contract Dispute
Case Filed:Jun 03, 2019
Terminated:Feb 11, 2020
Case in other court:District Court of Cleveland County, CJ-19-00601
Last checked: Saturday Nov 30, 2019 3:51 AM CST
Defendant
Bret Alan Samuel Fausett
Represented By
Michael A Furlong
Hartzog Conger Cason LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kristin Fausett Haddock
Represented By
Michael A Furlong
Hartzog Conger Cason LLP
contact info
Defendant
Kelly Fausett Ross
Represented By
Michael A Furlong
Hartzog Conger Cason LLP
contact info
Defendant
Logue Financial Services LLC
Represented By
Jon Epstein
Hall Estill-Okc
contact info
Defendant
Margaret Louise Logue
Represented By
Jon Epstein
Hall Estill-Okc
contact info
Defendant
AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company
Represented By
John M Thompson
Crowe & Dunlevy-Okc
contact info
Plaintiff
Alton Smith Fausett
Represented By
Clayton B Bruner
Pignato Cooper Kolker & Roberson PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Tuesday, February 11, 2020
36 36 order Administrative Closing Order Tue 02/11 4:53 PM
ADMINISTRATIVE CLOSING ORDER: On counsel's representation that the parties have reached a settlement and compromise of all claims in this case, it is ORDERED that the Clerk administratively terminate this action in her records. Unless a party moves to reopen or extend this proceeding within 45 days of the entry of this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed with prejudice, and this Order shall become a final judgment that satisfies the separate-document requirement for purposes of Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 58(a). Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 02/11/2020. (nv)
Related: [-]
Sunday, February 02, 2020
35 35 notice ~Notice (other) Sun 02/02 9:28 PM
NOTICE FROM THE COURT. Available on the website for the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, under "Rules & Procedures, Chambers Rules," are the following that are applicable in civil cases in front of Judge Dishman: (1) Chamber Procedures for Civil Cases (issued 1 28-2020 and (2) Civil Cases: Guidelines for Protective Orders on Confidentiality, Sealing Documents, and Redactions (issued 1 29-2020 . Parties are expected to comply with these rules for all filings and proceedings going forward. The Court intends to strike filings that fail to comply with these rules. (nv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2020
34 34 misc Disclosure Statement - Corporate Wed 01/22 2:41 PM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - CORPORATE by AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company . (Thompson, John)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 16, 2020
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Thu 01/16 3:13 PM
ORDER granting32 Motion for Extension of Time to File. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 01/16/2020. (em)
Related: [-]
32 32 motion Extension of Time Thu 01/16 1:57 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statement by AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company. (Thompson, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2020
31 31 misc Disclosure Statement - LLC Mon 01/13 10:35 AM
DISCLOSURE STATEMENT - LLC by Logue Financial Services LLC . (Epstein, Jon)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2020
30 30 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/10 3:27 PM
ORDER. A review of the filings in this case reveals that Defendant Logue Financial Services LLC, an Arkansas Limited Liability Company, has not filed a separate "Disclosure Statement Identifying Constituents of LLC or Partnership" in compliance with LCvR7.1.1 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. LCvR7.1.1 requires a party formed as a limited liability company or partnership to file a separate statement concurrently with its first filing in the case meeting the requirements of LCvR7.1.1. This Court therefore ORDERS Defendant Logue Financial Services LLC to file within 7 days of this Order its separate Disclosure Statement complying with LCvR7.1.1 and Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1. Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 01/10/20. (nv)
Related: [-]
29 29 2 pgs order Order Fri 01/10 3:23 PM
ORDER . A review of the filings in this case reveals that Defendant AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company has not filed a Corporate Disclosure Statement in compliance with Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 7.1, which requires in relevant part that a party must file the disclosure statement with its first appearance, pleading, petition, motion, response, or other request addressed to the court. See Fed. R. Civ. P. 7.1(b)(1). This Court therefore ORDERS Defendant AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company to file within 7 days of this Order its Corporate Disclosure Statement. A civil form called "Corporate Disclosure Form" is available on the website for the United States District Court for the Western District of Oklahoma, under the tab "Forms." Signed by Honorable Jodi W. Dishman on 01/10/20. (nv)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2020
28 28 2 pgs order Order Reassigning Case Wed 01/08 8:58 PM
ENTER ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Honorable Jodi W. Dishman for all further proceedings. Honorable Charles Goodwin no longer assigned to case. Signed by the direction of Honorable Charles Goodwin on 01/08/2020. (jb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 17, 2019
27 27 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 12/17 9:29 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re24 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Kelly Fausett Ross(Individually), Kelly Fausett Ross(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust).(Furlong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Excerpts from Transcript of Texas Probate Court Temporary Injunction Hearing Held September 26, 2019
Tuesday, December 10, 2019
26 26 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 12/10 4:46 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re24 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Alton Smith Fausett.(Bruner, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A.S. Fausett Affidavit
25 25 respm Response to Motion Tue 12/10 1:37 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re24 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint filed by Alton Smith Fausett.(Bruner, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A.S. Fausett Affidavit
Thursday, November 21, 2019
24 24 motion Dismiss Thu 11/21 10:53 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint by Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Kelly Fausett Ross(Individually), Kelly Fausett Ross(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust).(Furlong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Kristin Fausett Haddock,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Texas Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Agreed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Order Appointing Attorney ad Litem,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5 - Temporary Injunction,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6 - Affidavit of Bret Alan Samuel Fausett,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7 - Affidavit of Kelly Fausett Ross,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8 - Heffington v. Puleo,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9 - Dart-Barnett Operating Co. v. Esperada Texas LP
23 23 answer Answer to Amended Complaint Thu 11/21 5:03 PM
ANSWER to18 Amended Complaint by AXA Equitable Life Insurance Company.(Thompson, John)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 18, 2019
22 22 respm Response to Motion Mon 11/18 2:23 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re21 MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and/or Compel Arbitration and Brief in Support filed by Alton Smith Fausett.(Bruner, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Plaintiff,
Att: 2 Exhibit Original AXA Annuity Contract,
Att: 3 Exhibit Updated LPL Contract,
Att: 4 Exhibit AXA Change of Ownership Form
Friday, November 08, 2019
21 21 motion Dismiss Fri 11/08 2:29 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Second Amended Complaint and/or Compel Arbitration and Brief in Support by Margaret Louise Logue(as the Representative of the Alton Smith Fausett Retirement Account), Margaret Louise Logue(Individually), Logue Financial Services LLC.(Epstein, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Margaret Logue,
Att: 2 Exhibit New Account Application and Agreement [10.26.06],
Att: 3 Exhibit New Account Application and Agreement [5.14.07],
Att: 4 Exhibit Second Affidavit of Margaret Logue
Thursday, November 07, 2019
20 20 notice ~Notice (other) Thu 11/07 4:58 PM
NOTICE (other) by Alton Smith Fausett Partial Dismissal Without Prejudice (Bruner, Clayton)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Thu 11/07 10:43 AM
ORDER denying as moot5 Motion to Dismiss and6 Motion to Dismiss. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/07/2019. (jb)
Related: [-]
18 18 cmp Amended Complaint Thu 11/07 9:54 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT SECOND against All Defendants filed by Alton Smith Fausett.(Bruner, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit,
Att: 4 Exhibit,
Att: 5 Exhibit,
Att: 6 Exhibit,
Att: 7 Exhibit
Tuesday, November 05, 2019
17 17 4 pgs order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Tue 11/05 8:54 PM
ORDER granting13 Motion to Amend. Plaintiff is ordered to file his amended pleading within seven days of the date of this Order. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 11/05/2019. (jb)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 23, 2019
16 16 respm Response to Motion Mon 09/23 3:16 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by AXA Equitable Financial Services LLC. (Thompson, John)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2019
15 15 respm Response to Motion Wed 09/11 10:52 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Kelly Fausett Ross(Individually), Kelly Fausett Ross(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust).(Furlong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Towers Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Dominguez Order,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Campbell Stipulation,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4 - Countryman Order
Thursday, September 05, 2019
14 14 respm Response to Motion Thu 09/05 3:56 PM
RESPONSE to Motion re13 FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint filed by Margaret Louise Logue(as the Representative of the Alton Smith Fausett Retirement Account), Margaret Louise Logue(Individually), Logue Financial Services LLC. (Epstein, Jon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 21, 2019
13 13 motion Amend/Correct Wed 08/21 4:25 PM
FIRST MOTION to Amend/Correct Complaint by All Plaintiffs.(Bruner, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit,
Att: 3 Exhibit Proposed Order
Wednesday, July 17, 2019
12 12 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Wed 07/17 4:52 PM
ORDER granting10 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply re10 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to2 Amended Complaint . Responses due by 8/7/2019. Signed by Honorable Charles Goodwin on 07/17/2019. (jb)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2019
11 11 respm Reply to Response to Motion Tue 07/16 10:59 PM
REPLY to Response to Motion re6 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Kelly Fausett Ross(Individually), Kelly Fausett Ross(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust).(Furlong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Heffington v. Puleo
10 10 motion Extension of Time to File Response/Reply Tue 07/16 4:33 PM
UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to2 Amended Complaint by AXA Equitable Financial Services LLC. (Thompson, John)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 09, 2019
9 9 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Tue 07/09 7:03 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re6 MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Alton Smith Fausett.(Bruner, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit
Friday, July 05, 2019
8 8 respm Reply Fri 07/05 3:01 PM
REPLY by Defendants Margaret Louise Logue, Logue Financial Services LLC re5 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Compel Arbitration filed by Margaret Louise Logue(as the Representative of the Alton Smith Fausett Retirement Account), Logue Financial Services LLC.(Epstein, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Louise Affidavit
Friday, June 28, 2019
7 7 respm Response in Opposition to Motion Fri 06/28 7:12 PM
RESPONSE in Opposition re5 MOTION to Dismiss and/or Compel Arbitration filed by All Plaintiffs.(Bruner, Clayton)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
6 6 motion Dismiss Tue 06/18 11:24 PM
MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint by Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Kelly Fausett Ross(Individually), Kelly Fausett Ross(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust).(Furlong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Declaration of Kristin Fausett Haddock,
Att: 2 Exhibit Texas Petition,
Att: 3 Exhibit Agreed Order,
Att: 4 Exhibit Order Appointing Attorney Ad Litem,
Att: 5 Exhibit Affidavit of Bret Alan Samuel Fausett,
Att: 6 Exhibit Affidavit of Kelly Fausett Ross,
Att: 7 Exhibit Dart-Barnett Op. Co. v. Esperada Texas LP
Friday, June 07, 2019
5 5 motion Dismiss Fri 06/07 2:23 PM
MOTION to Dismiss and/or Compel Arbitration by Margaret Louise Logue(as the Representative of the Alton Smith Fausett Retirement Account), Margaret Louise Logue(Individually), Logue Financial Services LLC.(Epstein, Jon)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Affidavit of Margaret Logue,
Att: 2 Exhibit New Account Application and Agreement [10.26.06],
Att: 3 Exhibit New Account Application and Agreement [5.14.07]
4 4 notice Entry of Appearance Fri 06/07 2:19 PM
ENTRY of Appearance by Jon Epstein on behalf of Margaret Louise Logue(as the Representative of the Alton Smith Fausett Retirement Account), Margaret Louise Logue(Individually), Logue Financial Services LLC (Epstein, Jon)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
3 3 notice Entry of Appearance Wed 06/05 11:55 AM
ENTRY of Appearance by Michael A Furlong on behalf of Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Kelly Fausett Ross(Individually), Kelly Fausett Ross(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust) (Furlong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
2 2 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 06/04 2:50 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants filed by Alton Smith Fausett.(Bruner, Clayton)
Related: [-]
misc Payment for a Civil Case Tue 06/04 11:28 AM
PAYMENT FOR A CIVIL CASE Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 1087-2934716. (Furlong, Michael)
Related: [-]
Monday, June 03, 2019
1 1 cmp Notice of Removal Tue 06/04 10:05 AM
NOTICE OF REMOVAL from District Court of Cleveland County, case number CJ-2019-601 filed by Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Kristin Fausett Haddock(Individually), Kristin Fausett Haddock(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust), Kelly Fausett Ross(Individually), Bret Alan Samuel Fausett(Individually), Kelly Fausett Ross(as Trustee of the Alton Smith Fausett Family Trust).(ank)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Petition,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - State Court Docket Sheet,
Att: 3 Civil Cover Sheet