Wisconsin Eastern District Court
Judge:William C Griesbach
Case #: 1:19-cv-00836
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2019
Terminated:Sep 23, 2019
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2019 2:42 AM CST
Defendant
Carl Zeiss Vision Inc
12121 Scripps Summit Drive #400
San Diego, CA 92131
Represented By
Jonathan T Smies
Godfrey & Kahn Sc
contact info
Francis A Citera
Greenberg Traurig LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Cherry Optical Inc
Represented By
Jason R Just
Corneille Law Group
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/15/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Monday, September 23, 2019
20 20 order Judgment Mon 09/23 3:46 PM
JUDGMENT signed by Deputy Clerk and approved by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/23/2019. (cc: all counsel)(mac)
Related: [-]
19 19 1 pgs order Order Mon 09/23 3:44 PM
ORDER signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 9/23/2019. This matter is DISMISSED without prejudice. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2019
18 18 misc Letter Fri 09/20 12:54 PM
LETTER from Attorney Jason Just requesting dismissal be "without prejudice" . (Just, Jason)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2019
17 17 1 pgs order Order on Motion to Compel Fri 09/06 10:47 AM
ORDER granting11 Motion to Compel Arbitration. The court will dismiss the case unless the parties advise the court within fourteen days of any reason why this matter should be stayed. (cc: all counsel) (Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2019
16 16 misc Proposed Document Thu 09/05 1:12 PM
PROPOSED Order for Arbitration filed by Cherry Optical Inc. (Just, Jason)
Related: [-]
15 15 misc Stipulation Thu 09/05 1:10 PM
STIPULATION for Arbitration by Cherry Optical Inc. (Just, Jason)
Related: [-]
misc Notice of Electronic Filing Error Thu 09/05 3:01 PM
NOTICE of Electronic Filing Error re16 Proposed Document filed by Cherry Optical Inc ; This document should have been filed as an attachment to the Stipulation. This document does not need to be re-filed; Please refer to the policies and procedures for electronic case filing and the user manual found at www.wied.uscourts.gov (lh)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 26, 2019
14 14 misc Letter Mon 08/26 4:34 PM
LETTER from Attorney Jason R. Just Parties Intend to Arbitrate . (Just, Jason)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2019
13 13 respm Brief in Support of Motion Mon 08/05 3:22 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Carl Zeiss Vision Inc re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and MOTION to Compel Arbitration - Declaration of Cheryl Vescio In Support of Motion to Dismiss for Improper Venue and Compel Arbitration .(Citera, Francis)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Chery Optical-WSDA-2011-Executed,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2 - Cherry Optical-MDA-2014 Executed,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3 - Cherry Optical-PTLA-2014-Executed
12 12 respm Brief in Support of Motion Mon 08/05 3:18 PM
BRIEF in Support filed by Carl Zeiss Vision Inc re11 MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and MOTION to Compel Arbitration . (Citera, Francis)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Dismiss Compel Mon 08/05 3:16 PM
MOTION to Dismiss for Improper Venue and , MOTION to Compel Arbitration by Carl Zeiss Vision Inc. (Citera, Francis)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 31, 2019
10 10 1 pgs order Order Approving Stipulation Wed 07/31 9:46 AM
ORDER Approving6 Stipulation filed by Carl Zeiss Vision Inc, signed by Chief Judge William C Griesbach on 7/31/2019. (cc: all counsel)(Griesbach, William)
Related: [-]
Friday, July 26, 2019
9 9 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 3:08 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Francis A Citera on behalf of Carl Zeiss Vision Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Francis A. Citera (Citera, Francis)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 07/26 2:57 PM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cherry Optical Inc Plaintiff's Disclosure Statement (Just, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 07/26 2:55 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Cherry Optical Inc. (Just, Jason)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 07/26 2:22 PM
STIPULATION by Carl Zeiss Vision Inc.(Smies, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
5 5 misc Disclosure Statement Fri 07/26 2:18 PM
DISCLOSURE Statement by Carl Zeiss Vision Inc. (Smies, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 07/26 2:17 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Jonathan T Smies on behalf of Carl Zeiss Vision Inc. Attorney(s) appearing: Jonathan T. Smies (Smies, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 20, 2019
3 3 misc Certificate of Service Thu 06/20 10:55 AM
CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Cherry Optical Inc Filing of Waiver of the Service of Summons (Just, Jason)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Waiver of Service Executed Thu 06/20 10:53 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Carl Zeiss Vision Inc - Waiver sent on 6/5/2019. (Just, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 06/05 10:15 AM
COMPLAINT of Cherry Optical with Jury Demand; against Carl Zeiss Vision, Inc. by Cherry Optical Inc. ( Filing Fee PAID $400 receipt number AWIEDC-3128411)(Just, Jason) (jcl)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (6/5/2019) Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice of Judge Assignment Wed 06/05 10:24 AM
NOTICE Regarding assignment of this matter to Chief Judge William C Griesbach ;Consent/refusal forms for Magistrate Judge Duffin to be filed within 21 days;the consent/refusal form is available on our website ;pursuant to Civil Local Rule 7.1 a disclosure statement is to be filed upon the first filing of any paper and should be filed now if not already filed (jcl)
Related: [-]