Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01635
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Personal Injury
Case Filed:Jun 05, 2019
Case in other court:Minnesota, 0:19-cv-01351
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2019 3:42 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Defendant
3M OCCUPATIONAL SAFETY LLC
Defendant
AEARO HOLDING LLC
Defendant
AEARO INTERMEDIATE LLC
Defendant
AEARO LLC
Defendant
AEARO TECHNOLOGIES LLC
Plaintiff
JEREMY LEE
Represented By
Nathan M Hansen
Nathan M. Hansen, Attorney At Law
contact info
DANIEL ROBERT SEIDMAN
Seidman Margulis & Fairman Llp - Belleville Il
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Sunday, October 27, 2019
11 11 cmp Amended Complaint Sun 10/27 10:24 PM
SHORT FORM COMPLAINT AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by JEREMY LEE. (SEIDMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 13, 2019
10 10 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 06/13 12:15 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by DANIEL ROBERT SEIDMAN on behalf of All Plaintiffs (SEIDMAN, DANIEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
9 9 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Wed 06/05 12:58 PM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION. (djb)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 NOTICE REGARDING ELECTRONIC FILING REQUIREMENT
8 8 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Wed 06/05 12:56 PM
Case transferred in from District of Minnesota; Case Number 0:19-cv-01351. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
7 7 2 pgs order Order Wed 06/05 10:08 AM
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-14) transferring case to the Northern District of Florida per the MDL Panel for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings. Case assigned to Judge M. Casey Rodgers. (kt) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/5/2019.]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 23, 2019
6 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Lee. Aero Technologies, LLC served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Hansen, Nathan) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/5/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Jeremy Lee. 3M Company served on 5/23/2019, answer due 6/13/2019. (Hansen, Nathan) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/5/2019.]
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 22, 2019
4 4 Summons Issued as to 3M Company, Aero Technologies, LLC. (ACH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/5/2019.]
Related: [-]
3 3 TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Master list, referred to Magistrate Judge Steven E. Rau. Please use case number 19-cv-1351 MJD/SER. (ACH) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/5/2019.]
Related: [-]
2 2 MOTION for Admission Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Daniel Seidman. Filing fee $ 100, receipt number AMNDC-6892186 filed by Jeremy Lee. (Hansen, Nathan) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/5/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 COMPLAINT against 3M Company, Aero Technologies, LLC (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6892173) filed by Jeremy Lee. Filer requests summons issued. (Hansen, Nathan) [Transferred from Minnesota on 6/5/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet