Barbosa v. Barr et al
New York Eastern District Court | |
Judge: | Dora Lizette Irizarry |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-03345 |
Nature of Suit | 465 Immigration - Other Immigration Actions |
Cause | 28:2201 Declaratory Judgement |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 03, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2019 3:46 AM EST |
Defendant
US Attorney General William Pelham Barr
United States Attorney General 950 Pennsylvania Avenue NW
Washington, DC 20528 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director L. Francis Cissna
U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services 20 Massachusetts Avenue
Washington, DC 20529 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Director Loren K Miller
USCIS: Nebraska Service center 850 S St
Lincoln, NE 68508 |
Represented By
|
Defendant
Acting Secretary Chad F. Wolf
U.S. Department of Homeland Security 245 Murray Lane, S.W.
Washington, DC 20529 |
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Mr. Oliver Aquino Barbosa
37-11 87th Apt. 2
Jackson Heights, NY 11372 |
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 3 hours ago |
Wednesday, July 03, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() CLERK'S JUDGMENT that this action is dismissed without prejudice, with each party to bear its own costs, expenses, and fees. Signed Douglas C. Palmer, Clerk of Court by Jalitza Poveda, Deputy Clerk on 7/3/2019. (Lee, Tiffeny) |
|
order
Order Dismissing Case
Wed 07/03 10:44 AM
ORDER electronically endorsing8 . The Clerk of the Court is directed to enter judgment accordingly. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 7/3/2019. (Carosella, Christy) |
||
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal for the Court's endorsement by William Pelham Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Kevin K. McAleenan, Loren K Miller (Marutollo, Joseph) |
|
Monday, June 24, 2019 | ||
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph Anthony Marutollo on behalf of All Defendants (aty to be noticed) (Marutollo, Joseph) |
|
Tuesday, June 18, 2019 | ||
order
Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice
Tue 06/18 10:34 AM
ORDER granting6 Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice. So Ordered by Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry on 6/18/2019. (Carosella, Christy) |
||
Monday, June 17, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() First MOTION to Appear Pro Hac Vice Filing fee $ 150, receipt number ANYEDC-11583254. by Oliver Aquino Barbosa. (Levine, Kenneth) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
![]() This attorney case opening filing has been checked for quality control. See the attachment for corrections that were made, if any. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
4 | 4
![]() In accordance with Rule 73 of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure and Local Rule 73.1, the parties are notified that if all parties consent a United States magistrate judge of this court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action including a (jury or nonjury) trial and to order the entry of a final judgment. Attached to the Notice is a blank copy of the consent form that should be filled out, signed and filed electronically only if all parties wish to consent. The form may also be accessed at the following link:[LINK:http://www.uscourts.gov/uscourts/FormsAndFees/Forms/AO085.pdf] . You may withhold your consent without adverse substantive consequences . Do NOT return or file the consent unless all parties have signed the consent. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to All Defendants, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Bowens, Priscilla) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Proposed Summons.Civil Cover Sheet.. Re1 Complaint, by Oliver Aquino Barbosa (Crowley, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
utility
Case Assigned/Reassigned
Fri 06/07 9:26 AM
Case assigned to Chief Judge Dora Lizette Irizarry. Please download and review the Individual Practices of the assigned Judges, located on our[LINK:website] . Attorneys are responsible for providing courtesy copies to judges where their Individual Practices require such. (Bowens, Priscilla) |
||
Wednesday, June 05, 2019 | ||
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT against William Pelham Barr, L. Francis Cissna, Kevin K. McAleenan, Loren K Miller filing fee $ 400, receipt number ANYEDC-11547957 Was the Disclosure Statement on Civil Cover Sheet completed -yes,, filed by Oliver Aquino Barbosa. (Crowley, Patrick) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |
||
Att: 3
![]() |
||
Att: 4
![]() |
||
Att: 5
![]() |
||
Att: 6
![]() |
||
Att: 7
![]() |
||
Att: 8
![]() |
||
Att: 9
![]() |
||
Att: 10
![]() |
||
Att: 11
![]() |