UAB "Planner5D" v. Facebook, Inc. et al
California Northern District Court | |
Judge: | William H Orrick |
Referred: | Laurel Beeler |
Case #: | 3:19-cv-03132 |
Nature of Suit | 820 Property Rights - Copyrights |
Cause | 17:101 Copyright Infringement |
Case Filed: | Jun 05, 2019 |
Last checked: Monday Dec 02, 2019 12:34 AM PST |
Defendant
Facebook Technologies, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Facebook, Inc.
|
Represented By
|
Defendant
Trustees of Princeton University
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
UAB "Planner5D"
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 04/23/2024 11:59 PM PDT |
Tuesday, April 23, 2024 | ||
385 | 385
order
Order on Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed Order on Motion for Reconsideration
Tue 04/23 4:43 PM
ORDER by Judge Sallie Kim granting 382 Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed and denying 383 Motion for Reconsideration. (bxl, COURT STAFF) |
|
384 | 384
misc
Statement
Tue 04/23 10:52 AM
Statement re383 MOTION for Reconsideration re371 Order, Terminate Motions Order Regarding Discovery Letter Brief (Docket Nos. 365, 366) by Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale) |
|
Friday, April 19, 2024 | ||
383 | 383
motion
Reconsideration
Fri 04/19 11:24 PM
MOTION for Reconsideration re371 Order, Terminate Motions Order Regarding Discovery Letter Brief (Docket Nos. 365, 366) filed by UAB "Planner5D".(Bernstein, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of D. Forsyth iso Motion for Reconsideration, | ||
Att: 2 Declaration Redacted Version of R. DeLiberty Decl iso Motion for Reconsideration, | ||
Att: 3 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 1, | ||
Att: 4 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 2, | ||
Att: 5 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 3, | ||
Att: 6 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex 4, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 5, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex 6, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 7, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 8, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 9, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 10, | ||
Att: 13 Proposed Order | ||
382 | 382
motion
Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Partys Material Should Be Sealed
Fri 04/19 11:06 PM
Administrative Motion to Consider Whether Another Party's Material Should Be Sealed in Conjuction with Motion for Reconsideration of Magistrate Judge's Order on Discovery Letter Brief (ECF 371) filed by UAB "Planner5D".(Bernstein, Marc) |
|
Att: 1 Declaration of MNB iso Administrative Motion to Consider Sealing, | ||
Att: 2 Proposed Order, | ||
Att: 3 Sealed Version of Admin Motion for Reconsideration, | ||
Att: 4 Redacted Version of Admin Motion for Reocnsideration, | ||
Att: 5 Declaration Sealed Version of RADL Decl iso Admin Motion for Reconsideration, | ||
Att: 6 Declaration Redacted Version of RADL Decl iso Admin Motion for Reconsideration, | ||
Att: 7 Exhibit Sealed Version of Ex. 1, | ||
Att: 8 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 1, | ||
Att: 9 Exhibit Sealed Version of Ex. 2, | ||
Att: 10 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 2, | ||
Att: 11 Exhibit Sealed Version of Ex. 3, | ||
Att: 12 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 3, | ||
Att: 13 Exhibit Sealed Version of Ex. 4, | ||
Att: 14 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 4, | ||
Att: 15 Exhibit Sealed Version of Ex. 5, | ||
Att: 16 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 5, | ||
Att: 17 Exhibit Sealed Version of Ex. 6, | ||
Att: 18 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 6, | ||
Att: 19 Exhibit Sealed Version of Ex. 7, | ||
Att: 20 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 7, | ||
Att: 21 Exhibit Sealed Version of Ex. 8, | ||
Att: 22 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 8, | ||
Att: 23 Exhibit Sealed Version of Ex. 9, | ||
Att: 24 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 9, | ||
Att: 25 Exhibit Sealed Version of Ex. 10, | ||
Att: 26 Exhibit Redacted Version of Ex. 10 | ||
Tuesday, April 16, 2024 | ||
381 | 381
motion
Discovery Letter Brief
Tue 04/16 8:24 PM
Joint Discovery Letter Brief re: Discovery Dispute Concerning Planner 5Ds Response to Metas RFP No. 167 filed by Meta Platforms Technologies, LLC, Meta Platforms, Inc.. (Cendali, Dale) |
|
380 | 380
2
pgs
order
Order on Motion for Pro Hac Vice
Tue 04/16 1:23 PM
Order by Judge William H. Orrick granting 379 Motion for Pro Hac Vice by Miriam Kontoh. (jmd, COURT STAFF) |