Michigan Eastern District Court
Judge:Nancy G Edmunds
Referred: Stephanie Dawkins Davis
Case #: 2:19-cv-11671
Nature of Suit360 Torts - Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury
Cause28:1332 Diversity-(Citizenship)
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2019
Terminated:Jul 10, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 03, 2019 3:54 AM EST
Defendant
Kroger Co, The
Defendant
peyton's Northern Distribution Center Inc.
Defendant
Kroger Limited Partnership II d/b/a Peyton's Norther
Plaintiff
Fred Stanford
Represented By
Mark E. Boegehold
The Thurswell Law Firm
contact info

GPO Jul 10 2019
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)

Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, July 10, 2019
10 10 order Dismissing Case Wed 07/10 9:07 AM
ORDER DISMISSING CASE - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
9 9 respoth Response to Order to Show Cause Wed 07/03 3:18 PM
RESPONSE TO ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE by All Plaintiffs. (Boegehold, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 02, 2019
8 8 service Summons Issued* Tue 07/02 4:12 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Kroger Limited Partnership II d/b/a Peyton's Norther* (DWor)
Related: [-]
7 7 cmp Civil Case - Complaint, Amended Tue 07/02 3:03 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT with Jury Demand filed by Fred Stanford against Kroger Limited Partnership II d/b/a Peyton's Norther. NEW PARTIES ADDED. (Boegehold, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet
service Request for Additional Summons Tue 07/02 3:04 PM
REQUEST for SUMMONS for Kroger Limited Partnership II d/b/a Peyton's Norther. (Boegehold, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 25, 2019
6 6 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/25 1:41 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. peyton's Northern Distribution Center Inc. served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Boegehold, Mark)
Related: [-]
5 5 service Certificate of Service/Summons Returned Executed Tue 06/25 1:40 PM
CERTIFICATE of Service/Summons Returned Executed. Kroger Co, The served on 6/21/2019, answer due 7/12/2019. (Boegehold, Mark)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 18, 2019
4 4 order Show Cause Tue 06/18 11:23 AM
ORDER for Mark E. Boegehold for on behalf of Fred Stanford to Show Cause why in writing why this case should not be dismissed for lack of federal jurisdiction, specifically the lack of complete diversity of parties as required by 28 U.S.C. 1332(a). Show Cause Response due by 7/9/2019 - Signed by District Judge Nancy G. Edmunds. (LBar)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued* Thu 06/06 2:39 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *peyton's Northern Distribution Center Inc.* (SKra)
Related: [-]
2 2 service Summons Issued* Thu 06/06 2:38 PM
SUMMONS Issued for *Kroger Co, The* (SKra)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Civil Case - Complaint Thu 06/06 11:42 AM
COMPLAINT and Jury Demand filed by Fred Stanford against Kroger Co, The, peyton's Northern Distribution Center Inc. with Jury Demand. Plaintiff requests summons issued. Receipt No: 0645-7271957 - Fee: $ 400. County of 1st Plaintiff: Genesee - County Where Action Arose: Livingston - County of 1st Defendant: Hamilton. [ Previously dismissed case: No] [ Possible companion case(s): None ] (Boegehold, Mark)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Document Continuation Civil Cover Sheet
notice Notice to Parties of Consent of a Civil Action before a Magistrate Judge Option Thu 06/06 2:40 PM
A United States Magistrate Judge of this Court is available to conduct all proceedings in this civil action in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 636c and FRCP 73. The Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to a Magistrate Judge form is available for download at[LINK:http://www.mied.uscourts.gov] (SKra)
Related: [-]