Lucius v. Casa Violeta, LLC
Florida Southern District Court | |
Judge: | K Michael Moore |
Referred: | Jacqueline Becerra |
Case #: | 1:19-cv-22319 |
Nature of Suit | 446 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities - Other |
Cause | 42:12182 Americans with Disabilities Act |
Case Filed: | Jun 06, 2019 |
Terminated: | Jul 02, 2019 |
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 03, 2019 3:21 AM EST |
Defendant
Casa Violeta, LLC
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Windy Lucius
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 05/20/2025 11:59 PM EDT |
Monday, July 22, 2019 | ||
12 | 12
order
- Order (PAPERLESS or pdf attached)
Mon 07/22 5:28 PM
PAPERLESS ORDER. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice.11 . UPON CONSIDERATION of the Stipulation, the pertinent portions of the record, and being otherwise fully advised in the premises, it is hereby ORDERED AND ADJUDGED that the above-styled cause is hereby DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE. The Clerk of Court is instructed to CLOSE this case. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/22/2019. (jm01) |
|
11 | 11
![]() STIPULATION of Dismissal with Prejudice by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan) |
|
Tuesday, July 02, 2019 | ||
10 | 10
order
Order Dismissing Case
Tue 07/02 11:01 AM
PAPERLESS NOTICE OF COURT PRACTICE UPON NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT. THIS CAUSE came before the Court upon a Notice of Settlement stating that the Parties have settled this matter.9 . THE PARTIES are hereby directed to file a stipulation of dismissal of all claims signed by all parties pursuant to Rule 41(a), Fed. R. Civ. P., within twenty (20) days from the date of this Notice. If such papers are not filed within the time specified, this matter will be DISMISSED and the Court will be divested of jurisdiction to enforce the settlement agreement. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to administratively CLOSE this case. All pending motions, if any, are DENIED AS MOOT. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 7/2/2019. (eso) |
|
Monday, July 01, 2019 | ||
9 | 9
![]() NOTICE of Settlement by Windy Lucius (Cunningham, Juan) |
|
Thursday, June 20, 2019 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Corporate Disclosure Statement by Casa Violeta, LLC (Guerra-Valdes, Natalie) |
|
7 | 7
![]() NOTICE of Attorney Appearance by Natalie F. Guerra-Valdes on behalf of Casa Violeta, LLC. Attorney Natalie F. Guerra-Valdes added to party Casa Violeta, LLC(pty:dft). (Guerra-Valdes, Natalie) |
|
Wednesday, June 12, 2019 | ||
6 | 6
![]() SUMMONS (Affidavit) Returned Executed on1 Complaint with a 21 day response/answer filing deadline pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 12 by Windy Lucius. Casa Violeta, LLC served on 6/10/2019, answer due 7/1/2019. (Cunningham, Juan) |
|
Friday, June 07, 2019 | ||
5 | 5
order
Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge
Fri 06/07 10:47 AM
PAPERLESS ORDER REFERRING PRETRIAL DISCOVERY MATTERS TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JACQUELINE BECERRA. PURSUANT to 28 U.S.C. § 636 and the Magistrate Rules of the Local Rules of the Southern District of Florida, the above-captioned Cause is referred to United States Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra to take all necessary and proper action as required by law with respect to any and all pretrial discovery matters. Any motion affecting deadlines set by the Court's Scheduling Order is excluded from this referral, unless specifically referred by separate Order. It is FURTHER ORDERED that the parties shall comply with Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra's discovery procedures. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/7/2019. (eso) |
|
4 | 4
order
Pretrial Order
Fri 06/07 10:45 AM
PAPERLESS PRETRIAL ORDER. This order has been entered upon the filing of the complaint. Plaintiff's counsel is hereby ORDERED to forward to all defendants, upon receipt of a responsive pleading, a copy of this Order. It is further ORDERED that S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1 shall apply to this case and the parties shall hold a scheduling conference no later than twenty (20) days after the filing of the first responsive pleading by the last responding defendant, or within sixty (60) days after the filing of the complaint, whichever occurs first. However, if all defendants have not been served by the expiration of this deadline, Plaintiff shall move for an enlargement of time to hold the scheduling conference, not to exceed 90 days from the filing of the Complaint. Within ten (10) days of the scheduling conference, counsel shall file a joint scheduling report. Failure of counsel to file a joint scheduling report within the deadlines set forth above may result in dismissal, default, and the imposition of other sanctions including attorney's fees and costs. The parties should note that the time period for filing a joint scheduling report is not tolled by the filing of any other pleading, such as an amended complaint or Rule 12 motion. The scheduling conference may be held via telephone. At the conference, the parties shall comply with the following agenda that the Court adopts from S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1: (1) Documents (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.1 and 2) - The parties shall determine the procedure for exchanging a copy of, or a description by category and location of, all documents and other evidence that is reasonably available and that a party expects to offer or may offer if the need arises. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(B). (a) Documents include computations of the nature and extent of any category of damages claimed by the disclosing party unless the computations are privileged or otherwise protected from disclosure. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(C). (b) Documents include insurance agreements which may be at issue with the satisfaction of the judgment. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(D). (2) List of Witnesses - The parties shall exchange the name, address and telephone number of each individual known to have knowledge of the facts supporting the material allegations of the pleading filed by the party. Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1)(A). The parties have a continuing obligation to disclose this information. (3) Discussions and Deadlines (S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.B.2) - The parties shall discuss the nature and basis of their claims and defenses and the possibilities for a prompt settlement or resolution of the case. Failure to comply with this Order or to exchange the information listed above may result in sanctions and/or the exclusion of documents or witnesses at the time of trial. S.D. Fla. L.R. 16.1.I. Pursuant to Administrative Order 2016-70 of the Southern District of Florida and consistent with the Court of Appeals for the Eleventh Circuit's Local Rules and Internal Operating Procedures, within three days of the conclusion of a trial or other proceeding, parties must file via CM/ECF electronic versions of documentary exhibits admitted into evidence, including photographs of non-documentary physical exhibits. The Parties are directed to comply with each of the requirements set forth in Administrative Order 2016-70 unless directed otherwise by the Court. Telephonic appearances are not permitted for any purpose. Upon reaching a settlement in this matter the parties are instructed to notify the Court by telephone and to file a Notice of Settlement within twenty-four (24) hours. Signed by Chief Judge K. Michael Moore on 6/7/2019. (eso) |
|
Thursday, June 06, 2019 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Summons Issued as to Casa Violeta, LLC. (cds) |
|
2 | 2
order
Clerk's Notice of Judge Assignment and Optional Consent
Thu 06/06 12:48 PM
Clerks Notice of Judge Assignment to Chief Judge K. Michael Moore. Pursuant to 28 USC 636(c), the parties are hereby notified that the U.S. Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Becerra is available to handle any or all proceedings in this case. If agreed, parties should complete and file the Consent form found on our website. It is not necessary to file a document indicating lack of consent. Pro se (NON-PRISONER) litigants may receive Notices of Electronic Filings (NEFS) via email after filing a Consent by Pro Se Litigant (NON-PRISONER) to Receive Notices of Electronic Filing. The consent form is available under the forms section of our website. (cds) |
|
1 | 1
![]() COMPLAINT for Damages and Injunctive and Declaratory Relief against Casa Violeta, LLC. Filing fees $ 400.00 receipt number 113C-11707589, filed by Windy Lucius.(Cunningham, Juan) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Att: 2
![]() |