Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 5:18-bk-52440

Ohio Northern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Alan M Koschik
Case #: 5:19-ap-05064
Nature of Suit14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2019
Terminated:Feb 05, 2020
Last checked: never
Defendant
Triniti Communications Intl. LTD
4774 Munson Street, SW, Suite 214
Canton, OH 44718
Represented By
Triniti Communications Intl. LTD
contact info
Defendant
Darin L. Miller
4848 East Boulevard, NW
Canton, OH 44718
Represented By
Darin L. Miller
contact info
Plaintiff
Harold A. Corzin
304 N. Cleveland-Massillon Road
Akron, OH 44333
Represented By
Michael J. Moran
Gibson & Moran
contact info


Docket last updated: 12 hours ago
Tuesday, April 28, 2020
trustee Deferred Adversary Payment D: Cases Filed 06/01/2014 - Today Tue 04/28 3:03 PM
Deferred Adversary Payment for Cases Filed 06/01/2014 - Today. Fee Amount: $350.00. Check Number: 20103. (Corzin, Harold ach)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Auto-Docket of Credit Card Tue 04/28 3:04 PM
Receipt of Deferred Adversary Payment for Cases Filed 06/01/2014 - Today 19-05064 amk) [trustee,trdefap4] ( 350.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number 42067862. Fee amount 350.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#
Wednesday, February 05, 2020
court Close Adversary Case Wed 02/05 9:00 AM
Adversary Case 5:19-ap-5064 Closed (bhemi)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2020
15 15 3 pgs BNC Notice of Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Fri 01/24 12:26 AM
Notice of Order on Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 01/23/2020. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 14
Monday, January 20, 2020
14 14 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Tue 01/21 10:03 AM
Order Granting Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Related [+] Signed on 1/20/2020. (bhemi crt)
Related: [-] 11
Sunday, December 29, 2019
13 13 BNC Notice of Order (PDF) Mon 12/30 12:20 AM
Notice of Order (PDF) w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 12/29/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12
Friday, December 27, 2019
12 12 5 pgs order Order (PDF) Fri 12/27 10:05 AM
Order Authorizing Compromise of Controversy Related [+] **DOCKETED IN ADVERSARY FOR INFORMATIONAL PURPOSES ONLY** Signed on 12/27/2019 . (kdege crt)
Related: [-] lated Main Case Doc #35
Monday, December 09, 2019
court Hearing Not Held - CHAP ADI Mon 12/09 1:55 PM
Pretrial set for 12/18/2019 not necessary, case to be dismissed - - Related [+] (mknot)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Harold A. Corzin
Monday, November 11, 2019
11 11 2 pgs motion Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/11 1:37 PM
Motion to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding Filed by Harold A. Corzin (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2019
10 10 notice Notice (PDF) Mon 09/30 5:27 PM
Notice of Service of Subpoena Filed by Triniti Communications Intl. Ltd. (Williams, James aty)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 07, 2019
9 9 3 pgs BNC Notice of Scheduling Order Sun 09/08 12:22 AM
Notice of Scheduling Order w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 09/07/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8
Thursday, September 05, 2019
utility Corrective Entry Thu 09/05 7:42 AM
Corrective Entry Re: Discovery Deadline is 11/27/2019 and Stipulations Due 12/13/2019. Related [+] (bhemi)
Related: [-] Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI
Wednesday, September 04, 2019
8 8 2 pgs order Scheduling Order (PDF) Thu 09/05 7:43 AM
Discovery Scheduling Order Signed on 9/4/2019 . Pre-Trial Conference set for 12/18/2019 at 01:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. Discovery due by 11/27/2019. (bhemi crt)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 03, 2019
7 7 notice Notice (PDF) Tue 09/03 3:50 PM
Notice of Service of Interrogatories and Request for Admissions Filed by Harold A. Corzin. (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, July 24, 2019
court Hearing (Document) Sched/Cont/Resched No Notice - CHAP ADI Wed 07/24 3:15 PM
Pretrial Hearing held and Resched Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 01:30 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Harold A. Corzin
Wednesday, July 03, 2019
6 6 5 pgs answer Answer to Complaint Wed 07/03 4:24 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Darin L. Miller, Triniti Communications Intl. Ltd, Triniti Communications Intl. Ltd.. (Williams, James aty)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 5 pgs Exhibit A - Promissory Agreement
Thursday, June 13, 2019
court Hearing Set Thu 06/13 9:55 AM
Initial Pretrial Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 02:15 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Harold A. Corzin
Sunday, June 09, 2019
5 5 BNC Notice of Order on Pre-Trial Mon 06/10 12:18 AM
Notice of Order on Pre-Trial w/ BNC Certificate of Mailing Related [+] Notice Date 06/09/2019. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 3
Friday, June 07, 2019
4 4 cmp Summons Service Executed Fri 06/07 10:48 AM
Summons Service Executed on Darin L. Miller 6/7/2019; Triniti Communications Intl. LTD 6/7/2019; Triniti Communications Intl. LTD 6/7/2019 (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-]
3 3 order Relative to Pre-Trial (PDF) Fri 06/07 8:40 AM
Order Relative to Pre-Trial Signed on 6/7/2019 Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 7/24/2019 at 02:00 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot crt)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint
2 2 2 pgs cmp Summons Issued Fri 06/07 8:34 AM
Summons issued on Plaintiff for service on Defendant(s) Darin L. Miller Answer due 7/8/2019; Triniti Communications Intl. LTD Answer due 7/8/2019; Triniti Communications Intl. LTD Answer due 7/8/2019. This Court has adopted a paperless procedure for issuing the summons in an adversary proceeding. The attached summons has been sealed, processed, and docketed by the Clerk. Electronic filers will only receive electronic email notice of this docket entry. No paper copy of the summons will be mailed; it must be printed from CM/ECF. Pursuant to Bankruptcy Rule 7004(a) and F.R.C.P. 4, it is the responsibility of the plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel to promptly serve the summons, a copy of the complaint, and, if applicable, a copy of any pre-trial or adversary case management order on defendant(s). To be timely, the summons and a copy of the complaint must be served within seven (7) days of issuance per Bankruptcy Rule 7004(e). Service of the summons is prescribed by Bankruptcy Rule 7004 and F.R.C.P. 4. If a summons is not timely served, an ''alias'' summons must be requested from the Clerk. Certification or proof of service by plaintiff or plaintiff's counsel is made by completing the Certificate of Service portion of the original summons. Attorneys should docket the summons, once served, using the Summons Service Executed event within CM/ECF. Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 02:00 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot)
Related: [-] Hearing Set
court Hearing Set Fri 06/07 8:29 AM
Initial Pretrial Related [+] Pre-Trial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 02:00 PM at 260 Fed Bldg Akron. (mknot)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Harold A. Corzin
Thursday, June 06, 2019
1 1 38 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/06 12:32 PM
Adversary case 19-05064 Complaint by Harold A. Corzin against Triniti Communications Intl. LTD, Triniti Communications Intl. LTD, Darin L. Miller. Fee Amount $0 Nature of Suit:14 Related [+] (Moran, Michael aty)
Related: [-] covery of money/property - other