Consolidated
Lead case: 3:19-md-02885

Florida Northern District Court
Judge:M Casey Rodgers
Referred: Gary R Jones
Case #: 3:19-cv-01650
Nature of Suit365 Torts - Personal Injury - Product Liability
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Product Liability
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2019
Case in other court:California Central, 2:19-cv-04547
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 03, 2019 4:08 AM EST
Defendant
3M COMPANY
Represented By
KIMBERLY O BRANSCOME
Kirkland & Ellis Llp - Los Angeles Ca
contact info
Defendant
DOES
Plaintiff
CAMERON THOMPSON
Represented By
Mohamad Saleh Ahmad
Kermani LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/02/2025 11:59 PM EDT
Tuesday, March 02, 2021
18 18 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Tue 03/02 2:24 PM
ORDER granting as requested 16 MOTION to Substitute Attorney. Attorney GERALD B SINGLETON for CAMERON THOMPSON added. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 3/2/2021. (djb)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 01, 2021
17 17 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 03/01 6:05 PM
First AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants All Defendants., filed by CAMERON THOMPSON. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
utility Action Required by District Judge - No NEFs in SEALED Cases Mon 03/01 8:39 AM
ACTION REQUIRED BY DISTRICT JUDGE: Chambers of JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS notified that action is needed Re:16 MOTION to Withdrawal and Substitute Attorney (djb)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 26, 2021
16 16 motion Substitute Attorney Fri 02/26 6:35 PM
MOTION to Substitute Attorney by CAMERON THOMPSON. (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
15 15 notice Notice of Appearance Fri 02/26 6:18 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by GERALD B SINGLETON on behalf of CAMERON THOMPSON (SINGLETON, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 08, 2021
14 14 4 pgs order Order ~Util - Set Deadlines Mon 02/08 2:23 PM
PRETRIAL ORDER NO. 17 ORDER GOVERNING ADOPTION OF MASTER COMPLAINT AND SHORT FORM COMPLAINT FOR FILED CASES. Any Plaintiff whose case becomes part of this MDL after the date of this Order, either by a direct filing and assignment to this Court (if permitted by subsequent order of the Court) or by transfer from another district or from another judge in this district, must file a Short Form Complaint within 20 days from the date of transfer or, if originally filed in this district, assignment to this Court. Signed by JUDGE M CASEY RODGERS on 10/16/2019. (Amended (Short Form) Complaint due by 3/1/2021 .) Notice Regarding Attorney Admission posted on 6/6/2019 and this Order Emailed to Attorney of Record, Mohamad Saleh Ahmad. (djb)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2019
13 13 notice Notice - Other - See Separate Menu for Ntc of Appeal Options Thu 06/06 10:36 AM
NOTICE REGARDING ATTORNEY ADMISSION re: counsel for Plaintiff, CAMERON THOMPSON. (djb)
Related: [-]
12 12 transfer Case Transferred In - District Transfer (COURT USE ONLY) Thu 06/06 10:24 AM
Case transferred in from District of California Central; Case Number 2:19-cv-04547. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, June 05, 2019
11 11 Conditional Transfer Order - 14 from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2885, transferring case to USDC, Northern District of Florida and assigned to Honorable M. Casey Rodgers. Case transferred electronically on 6/5/2019. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (mrgo) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 31, 2019
10 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to 3M Company answer now due 6/5/2019, filed by Defendant 3M Company.(Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Friday, May 24, 2019
9 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
8 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
7 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant 3M Company, re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),1 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties5 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71)2 , Notice (Other)4 , Notice of Related Case(s)3 , Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel (G-123),6 served on May 24, 2019. (Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
6 6 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Kimberly O Branscome counsel for Defendant 3M Company. Adding Kimberly O. Branscome as counsel of record for Defendant 3M Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
5 5 Defendant 3M Company's Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. Proc. 7.1 and CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant 3M Company, (Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
4 4 NOTICE by Defendant 3M Company of Pendency of Other Actions Pursuant to L.R. 83-1.4.1 filed by Defendant 3M Company.(Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
3 3 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant 3M Company.(Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
2 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of the State of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 19STCV15033 Receipt No: 0973-23801911 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant 3M Company. (Attorney Kimberly O Branscome added to party 3M Company(pty:dft))(Branscome, Kimberly) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit B
CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against defendants 3M Company, Does, Jury Demand, filed by plaintiff Cameron Thompson. (Filed in state court 4/30/19, submitted as document 1, attachment 1) (esa) [Transferred from California Central on 6/6/2019.]
Related: [-]