Minnesota District Court
Judge:Michael J Davis
Referred: Elizabeth Cowan Wright
Case #: 0:19-cv-01496
Nature of Suit445 Civil Rights - Amer w/Disabilities-Employment
Cause42:12101 Americans with Disabilities Act
Case Filed:Jun 06, 2019
Last checked: Tuesday Dec 03, 2019 3:03 AM CST
Defendant
Buth-Na-Bodhaige, Inc.
Represented By
Jonathan P Norrie
Bassford Remele
contact info
Plaintiff
Julie Crotty
Represented By
Frederick L Neff
Neff Law Firm, P.A.
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
The Body Shop
Terminated: 08/13/2019
Defendant
Body Shop, The
Terminated: 08/13/2019
Defendant
Natura & Co
Terminated: 08/13/2019


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Wednesday, January 15, 2020
10 10 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 01/15 5:07 PM
NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by Julie Crotty (Neff, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 30, 2019
9 9 notice Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney Wed 10/30 4:45 PM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: Notice re: Non-Admitted Attorney We have received documents listing Paul C. Evans, Christen L. Casale as counsel of record. If he or she wishes to be listed as an attorney of record in this case, he or she must be admitted to the bar of the U.S. District Court of Minnesota in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (a), (b) and (c)] or temporarily admitted pro hac vice in accordance with [LINK:Local Rule 83.5 (d) or (e)] . For more admissions information and forms, please see the Attorney Forms Section of the courts website at [LINK:href=http://www.mnd.uscourts.gov/FORMS/court_forms.shtml#attorneyforms] [LINK:. (lmb)
Related: [-]
8 8 1 pgs order Order on Stipulation Wed 10/30 12:06 PM
ORDER on6 Stipulation. 1.This action is stayed until January 27, 2020, including but not limited to Defendants obligation to respond to the Amended Complaint.2.The Parties shall provide an update to the Court by January 27, 2020 regarding the status of mediation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright on 10/30/2019. (TMA)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2019
7 7 misc Proposed Order to Judge re Stipulation Tue 10/29 4:46 PM
PROPOSED ORDER TO JUDGE re6 Stipulation. (Norrie, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Stipulation Tue 10/29 4:44 PM
STIPULATION to Stay the Proceedings Pending Private Mediation by Buth-Na-Bodhaige, Inc.. Jointly Signed by Julie Crotty. (Norrie, Jonathan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 15, 2019
5 5 2 pgs service Summons Issued Thu 08/15 2:09 PM
Summons Issued as to Buth-Na-Bodhaige, Inc. (CLK)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 13, 2019
4 4 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/13 5:51 PM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against Buth-Na-Bodhaige, Inc.. filed by Julie Crotty. Filer requests summons issued. (Neff, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit 0,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit T
Friday, June 07, 2019
3 3 service Summons Issued Fri 06/07 9:45 AM
Summons Issued as to Body Shop, The, Natura & Co, The Body Shop. (ACH)
Related: [-]
2 2 notice Notice of Initial Case Assignment Fri 06/07 9:42 AM
TEXT ONLY ENTRY: CLERK'S NOTICE OF INITIAL CASE ASSIGNMENT. Case assigned to Judge Michael J. Davis per 3rd/4th Civil Rights list, referred to Magistrate Judge Elizabeth Cowan Wright. Please use case number 19-cv-1496 MJD/ECW. (ACH)
Related: [-]
Thursday, June 06, 2019
1 1 132 pgs cmp Complaint Thu 06/06 6:28 PM
COMPLAINT against The Body Shop (filing fee $ 400, receipt number AMNDC-6923196) filed by Julie Crotty. Filer requests summons issued. (Neff, Frederick)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit D,
Att: 5 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit E,
Att: 6 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit F,
Att: 7 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit G,
Att: 8 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit H,
Att: 9 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit I,
Att: 10 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit J,
Att: 11 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit K,
Att: 12 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit L,
Att: 13 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit M,
Att: 14 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit N,
Att: 15 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit O,
Att: 16 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit P,
Att: 17 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit Q,
Att: 18 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit R,
Att: 19 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit S,
Att: 20 Exhibit(s) Crotty Exhibit T,
Att: 21 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet