California Central District Court
Case #: 2:19-cr-00331
Case Filed:Jun 04, 2019
Last checked: Friday Jun 07, 2019 12:19 AM PDT
Defendant
Felecia Edna Taylor (1)
Represented By
Amy M Karlin
Federal Public Defenders Office
contact info
Plaintiff
USA
Represented By
Jennifer L Waier
Ausa - Office Of Us Attorney
contact info


Docket last updated: 06/07/2019 2:10 AM PDT
Wednesday, May 08, 2019
1 1 COMPLAINT filed as to Defendant Felecia Edna Taylor in violation of 18:201(b)(2). Approved by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth as to Felecia Edna Taylor (1). (ja) [2:19-mj-01949-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 09, 2019
3 3 REPORT COMMENCING CRIMINAL ACTION as to Defendant Felecia Edna Taylor; defendants Year of Birth: 1968; date of arrest: 5/9/2019 (ja) [2:19-mj-01949-DUTY]
Related: [-]
4 4 MINUTES OF INITIAL APPEARANCE ON LOCAL COMPLAINT held before Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth as to Defendant Felecia Edna Taylor. Defendant arraigned and advised of the charges. Defendant states true name as charged.Attorney: Amy M Karlin for Felecia Edna Taylor, Deputy Federal Public Defender, present.Court orders bail set as: Felecia Edna Taylor (1) $15,000.00 Appearance Bond, SEE ATTACHED BOND FOR TERMS AND CONDITIONS. Defendant remanded to the custody of the U.S. Marshal. Post-Indictment Arraignment set for 6/13/2019 11:00 AM before Duty Magistrate Judge. Release Order No 36422. Court Smart: CS 5/9/19. (ja) [2:19-mj-01949-DUTY]
Related: [-]
5 5 FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT filed as to Defendant Felecia Edna Taylor. ( Not for Public View pursuant to the E-Government Act of 2002) (ja) [2:19-mj-01949-DUTY]
Related: [-]
6 6 WAIVER of Preliminary Examination or Hearing by Defendant Felecia Edna Taylor (ja) [2:19-mj-01949-DUTY]
Related: [-]
7 7 NOTICE DIRECTING DEFENDANT TO APPEAR for Preliminary Hearing and Arraignment on Indictment/Information. Defendant Felecia Edna Taylor is directed to appear and for Post Indictment Arraignment on 6/13/19 at 11:00 AM before the Duty Magistrate Judge. (ja) [2:19-mj-01949-DUTY]
Related: [-]
8 8 BOND AND CONDITIONS OF RELEASE filed as to Defendant Felecia Edna Taylor conditions of release: $15,000.00 Appearance Bond approved by Magistrate Judge Autumn D. Spaeth. (ja) [2:19-mj-01949-DUTY]
Related: [-]
9 9 DECLARATION RE: PASSPORT filed by Defendant Felecia Edna Taylor, declaring that I am unable to locate my passport(s) or other travel document(s). If I locate any passport or other travel document issued to me, I will immediately surrender it to the U.S. Pretrial Services Agency. I will not apply for a passport or other travel document during the pendency of this case. RE: Bond and Conditions (CR-1)8 . (ja) [2:19-mj-01949-DUTY]
Related: [-]
10 10 ARREST WARRANT RETURNED Executed on 5/9/19 as to Defendant Felecia Edna Taylor. (ja) [2:19-mj-01949-DUTY]
Related: [-]
Tuesday, June 04, 2019
11 11 INFORMATION filed as to Felecia Edna Taylor (1) count(s) 1. Offense occurred in LA. (mhe)
Related: [-]
12 12 CASE SUMMARY filed by AUSA Jennifer L Waier as to Defendant Felecia Edna Taylor; defendants Year of Birth: 1968 (mhe)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA (See attachment) (mhe)
Related: [-]
14 14 3 pgs MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff USA (See attachment) (mhe)
Related: [-]