Consolidated
Lead case: 3:15-md-02672

California Northern District Court
Judge:Charles R Breyer
Case #: 3:19-cv-02969
Nature of Suit370 Torts - Personal Property - Other Fraud
Cause28:1441 Petition for Removal- Fraud
Case Filed:Sep 05, 2017
Case in other court:Texas Western, 1:17-cv-00785
Last checked: Friday Jun 07, 2019 8:03 PM PDT
Defendant
Volkswagen Group of America Inc
Represented By
Darrell L. Barger
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer LLP
contact info
C. Vernon Hartline, Jr.
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer LLP
contact info
William B. Monahan
Sullivan And Cromwell LLP
contact info
John C Dacus
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer LLP
contact info
Richard White Crews, Jr
Hartline Dacus Barger Dreyer LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Maribel Quiros
Represented By
Eric D. Pearson
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Charles W. Miller
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Craig M. Patrick
Patrick Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Jennifer Rightmer
Represented By
Eric D. Pearson
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Charles W. Miller
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Craig M. Patrick
Patrick Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Veronica Salgado
Represented By
Eric D. Pearson
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Charles W. Miller
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Craig M. Patrick
Patrick Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Anisleidy Santiesteban
Represented By
Eric D. Pearson
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Charles W. Miller
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Craig M. Patrick
Patrick Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Michael Seerden
Represented By
Eric D. Pearson
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Charles W. Miller
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Craig M. Patrick
Patrick Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Niranjan Segal
Represented By
Eric D. Pearson
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Charles W. Miller
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Craig M. Patrick
Patrick Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Manjeet Singh
Represented By
Eric D. Pearson
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Charles W. Miller
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Craig M. Patrick
Patrick Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Pirtal Singh
Represented By
Eric D. Pearson
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Charles W. Miller
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Craig M. Patrick
Patrick Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Plaintiff
Gail Stern
Represented By
Eric D. Pearson
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Charles W. Miller
Heygood, Orr & Pearson
contact info
Craig M. Patrick
Patrick Law Firm, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 22 minutes ago
Wednesday, May 29, 2019
7 7 5 pgs order Order Thu 06/06 11:57 AM
ORDER granting in part certain Texas plaintiffs' Motions to Remand. Signed by Judge Charles R. Breyer on 5/14/19. (mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 26, 2017
Electronic filing error. Counsel are reminded to e-file all documents in the Master File 15-md-2672. Please see Pretrial Order No. 1 (mclS, COURT STAFF)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 22, 2017
6 6 STIPULATION OF DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE AS TO CERTAIN PLAINTIFFS filed by Russell Christensen, Cynthia Lavas, George Masih. (Patrick, Craig)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 05, 2017
5 5 Case transferred in from District of Texas Western; Case Number 1:17-cv-00785. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 30, 2017
4 4 Conditional Transfer Order entered by the Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation. Signed by Jeffery N. Luthi, Clerk of the Panel. (dm)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 16, 2017
3 3 NOTICE - AMENDED by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc re2 Notice (Other),,,,(Crews, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C
Tuesday, August 15, 2017
2 2 NOTICE - AMENDED by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc(Crews, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment,
Att: 3 Supplement,
Att: 4 Supplement Attachment,
Att: 5 Exhibit A - Index,
Att: 6 Exhibit A-1 Docket,
Att: 7 Exhibit A-2 Plaintiffsf' Original Petition and Request for Disclosure,
Att: 8 Exhibit A-3 Civil Case Information Sheet,
Att: 9 Exhibit A-4 Jury Demand,
Att: 10 Exhibit A-5 Citation Issue,
Att: 11 Exhibit A-6 Citation Return,
Att: 12 Exhibit A-7 Defendant's Notice to Court of Filing Motio to Transfer,
Att: 13 Exhibit A-8 Trial Notice,
Att: 14 Exhibit A-9 Trial Notice,
Att: 15 Exhibit A-10 Trial Notice,
Att: 16 Exhibit A-11 Mediation Order,
Att: 17 Exhibit A-12 Notice of Transfer Pursuant to Rule 13,
Att: 18 Exhibit A-13 Notice of Transfer Pursuant to Rule 13,
Att: 19 Exhibit A-14 Volkswage Group of America, Inc.'s Original Answer,
Att: 20 Exhibit A-15 Notice of Nonsuit,
Att: 21 Exhibit A-16 Notice of Nonsuit,
Att: 22 Exhibit Ex B - JPML Order,
Att: 23 Exhibit Ex C - Demand Letters,
Att: 24 Exhibit Ex D - Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition and Jury Trial Deman
Case Assigned to Judge Lee Yeakel. CM WILL NOW REFLECT THE JUDGE INITIALS AS PART OF THE CASE NUMBER. PLEASE APPEND THESE JUDGE INITIALS TO THE CASE NUMBER ON EACH DOCUMENT THAT YOU FILE IN THIS CASE. (td)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 14, 2017
1 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0542-9878046), filed by Volkswagen Group of America, Inc.(Crews, Richard)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Civil Cover Sheet Attachment,
Att: 3 Supplement Civil Cover Sheet Supplement,
Att: 4 Supplement Civil Cover sheet Supplement Attachment,
Att: 5 Exhibit A - Index,
Att: 6 Exhibit A-1 Docket Sheet,
Att: 7 Exhibit A-2 Plaintiffs' Original Petition and Request for Disclosure,
Att: 8 Exhibit A-3 Civil Case Information Sheet,
Att: 9 Exhibit A-4 Jury Demand,
Att: 10 Exhibit A-5 Citiation Issue,
Att: 11 Exhibit A-6 Citation Return,
Att: 12 Exhibit A-7 Defendant's Notice to Court of Filing Motion to Transfer,
Att: 13 Exhibit A-8 Jury Trial Notice,
Att: 14 Exhibit A-9 Jury Trial Notice,
Att: 15 Exhibit A-10 Jury Trial Notice,
Att: 16 Exhibit A-11 Mediation Order,
Att: 17 Exhibit A-12 Notice of Transfer,
Att: 18 Exhibit A-13 Notice of Transfer,
Att: 19 Exhibit A-14 Volkswage Group fo America, Inc.'s Original Answer,
Att: 20 Exhibit A-15 Notice of Nonsuit,
Att: 21 Exhibit A-16 Notice of Nonsuit,
Att: 22 Exhibit Ex B - JPML Order,
Att: 23 Exhibit Ex C - Deman Letters,
Att: 24 Exhibit Ex D - Plaintiffs' First Amended Petition and Jury Trial Deman
DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Russell Christensen, Curtis Clements, Dusty Dailley, Jack Edwards, Cynthia Lavas, Zak Mailey, George Masih, Don E. McClure, Jr., Garrett McGillis, Joel Pierce, Volkswagen Group of America, Inc. (td)
Related: [-]