New Hampshire District Court
Judge:Andrea K Johnstone
Case #: 1:19-cv-00627
Nature of Suit840 Property Rights - Trademark
Cause15:1125 Trademark Infringement (Lanham Act)
Case Filed:Jun 07, 2019
Re-opened:Sep 14, 2020
Terminated:Dec 29, 2020
Last checked: Wednesday Dec 04, 2019 4:16 AM EST
Defendant
JSI Research and Training Institute, Inc.
Represented By
Laura L. Carroll
Burns & Levinson LLP
contact info
Defendant
Opentip.Com
Represented By
Wilfred J. Desmarais, Jr.
Desmarais Law Group PLLC
contact info
Debra L. Mayotte
Desmarais Law Group PLLC
contact info
Defendant
TickCheck, LLC
Represented By
Alexander J. Marek
Law Offices Of Alexander J. Marek, PLLC
contact info
Nicholas F. Casolaro
Cleveland Waters & Bass PA
contact info
Plaintiff
Ticked Off, Inc.
99 Spruce Lane
Dover, NH 03820
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Spear
Orr & Reno PA
contact info
James F. Laboe
Orr & Reno PA
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Live Safely Products, Inc.
Terminated: 10/31/2019
Represented By
Michele E. Kenney
Pierce Atwood LLP
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Tuesday, December 29, 2020
order Endorsed Order - not on motion Tue 12/29 12:03 PM
ENDORSED ORDER re: 80 Stipulation of Dismissal as to TickCheck LLC. Text of Order: Reviewed. So Ordered by Magistrate Judge Andrea K. Johnstone.(kad)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Civil Case Tue 12/29 12:04 PM
Civil Case Terminated. (kad)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 28, 2020
80 80 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Mon 12/28 2:05 PM
///STIPULATION of Dismissal as to TickCheck LLC by Ticked Off, Inc.(Spear, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]